Muhammad v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Dante K. Muhammad
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Government National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 2:2019cv12614
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Avern Cohn
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Gottlieb, Amy)
October 17, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Dante K. Muhammad [E-Filer]. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit) (Muhammad [E-Filer], Dante)
October 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DENIAL of Clerk's Entry of Default JUDGMENT as to *Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.*. Reason: *Dispositive motion filed 09/30/2019* (SSch)
October 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DENIAL of Clerk's Entry of Default as to *Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.*. Reason: *Dispositive motion filed 09/30/2019* (SSch)
October 17, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Judgment by Default with Affidavit of Sum Certain as to Dante K. Muhammad [E-Filer] by Dante K. Muhammad [E-Filer]. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Certificate of Service) (Muhammad [E-Filer], Dante) Modified on 10/17/2019 (SSch). [REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGEMENT AS TO WELLS FARGO BANK NA]
October 16, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #13 Request for Clerks Entry of Default by Dante K. Muhammad [E-Filer] (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (Muhammad [E-Filer], Dante)
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Dante K. Muhammad [E-Filer] by Dante K. Muhammad [E-Filer]. (Muhammad [E-Filer], Dante) Modified on 10/17/2019 (SSch). [REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO WELLS FARGO BANK NA]
October 10, 2019 NOTICE of Error directed to: Myles J. Baker re #12 Certificate of Service. Document is prohibited discovery, disclosure or a certificate of service thereof. Document was stricken. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DAll)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 [STRICKEN] CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Defendants for Defendants' Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Baker, Myles) Modified on 10/10/2019 (DAll).
October 4, 2019 Pro Se E-filing Account Created for Dante K. Muhammad [E-Filer]. (NAhm)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Sabbota Gottlieb on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Gottlieb, Amy)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 Pro Se Application for E-filing submitted by Dante K. Muhammad. [APPROVED] (NAhm)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Note, #3 Exhibit Mortgate, #4 Exhibit Complaint, #5 Exhibit Order, #6 Exhibit Adversary Complaint, #7 Exhibit Order, #8 Exhibit Case Law, #9 Exhibit Case Law) (Baker, Myles)
September 24, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #8 Order of Reassignment on Dante K. Muhammad at 24604 Templar Ave., Southfield, MI 48075. (LVer)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Avern Cohn to District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (NAhm)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Summons and #1 Complaint upon defendants, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General by Dante K. Muhammad (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation, #3 Document Continuation) (DPer)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris to Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SSch)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Summons and #1 Complaint upon defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General by Dante K. Muhammad (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation, #3 Document Continuation) (DPer)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 Pro Se Application for E-filing submitted by Dante K. Muhammad [DENIED - EMAIL ADDRESS AND PHONE NUMBER NOT PROVIDED IN APPLICATION] (DPer)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General * (DPer)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dante K. Muhammad against defendants; Receipt No: 125156 - Fee: $ 400. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhammad v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dante K. Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government National Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?