Noden et al v. Wemo Nederland B.V. et al
Defendant: Fortress Interlocks America, Wemo Nederland B.V., Necia Noden, Fortress Interlocks Limited, Halma PLC, Wemo International and Tate Norden
Case Number: 2:2019cv12628
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motions Hearing on 10/15/2019 is Cancelled. (EKar)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting Motion to Withdraw #4 and Unopposed Motion to Remand #6 . Remanding Case to Lenawee County Circuit Court. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 [DEFENDANTS WEMO INTERNATIONAL, BV, AND WEMO NEDERLAND, BVS CONCURRENCE IN DEFENDANTS HALMA PLC, FORTRESS INTERLOCKS LTD, AND FORTRESS INTERLOCKS AMERICAS AMENDED MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL] NOTICE of Joinder/Concurrence in #4 MOTION to Withdraw filed by Fortress Interlocks America by Wemo International, Wemo Nederland B.V. (Hart, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/10/2019 (LGra).
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs (Morgan, Courtney)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Withdraw filed by All Plaintiffs. (Morgan, Courtney)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Luke David Wolf appearing on behalf of Wemo International, Wemo Nederland B.V. (Wolf, Luke)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey C. Hart appearing on behalf of Wemo International, Wemo Nederland B.V. (Hart, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING on #6 MOTION to Remand . Response due by 10/9/2019 and Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2019 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Third Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Pilz MiLARA, #3 Exhibit 3-Dismissal Order-Troax 2-27-18, #4 Exhibit 4-Dismissal Order-Pilz 4-16-19, #5 Exhibit 5-Porritt 9-13-19, #6 Exhibit 6-From Connaughton 4-22-19, #7 Exhibit 7-Complaint for Injunction and TRO, #8 Exhibit 8-9-19-19 Email with Stip and Order for Dismissal) (Morgan, Courtney)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF HEARING on #4 MOTION to Withdrawal of Notice of Removal . Response due by 10/9/2019. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2019 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Withdraw by Fortress Interlocks America. (Porritt, Russell) Modified on 9/24/2019 (DWor). [AMENDED]
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER STRIKING Defendant's #3 MOTION to Withdraw for failure to comply with the concurrence requirements of E.D. Mich. LR 7.1 (a). Issued by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 [STRICKEN] MOTION to Withdraw by Fortress Interlocks America. (Porritt, Russell) Modified on 9/23/2019 (EKar).
September 9, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fortress Interlocks America, Fortress Interlocks Limited from LENAWEE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT, case number 16-5555-CZ. Receipt No: 0645-7396112 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Porritt, Russell)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE by Fortress Interlocks America Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Porritt, Russell) Modified on 9/9/2019 (SSch). [ATTORNEY TO RE-FILED REMOVAL]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noden et al v. Wemo Nederland B.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortress Interlocks America
Represented By: Russell W. Porritt, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wemo Nederland B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Necia Noden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortress Interlocks Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halma PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wemo International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Norden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?