Orleans International, Inc. v. 7S Packing, LLC
Plaintiff: Orleans International, Inc.
Defendant: 7S Packing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv12713
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Alternatively Transfer Venue, or Abstain filed by 7S Packing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 14-Travis Cty, TX Pleading) (Brooks, Keefe)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Alternatively Transfer Venue, or Abstain filed by Orleans International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit) (Cwagenberg, Philip)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Alternatively Transfer Venue, or Abstain by 7S Packing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-Schilderink Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 2-Bankruptcy Order, #4 Exhibit 3-Shultz Affidavit, #5 Exhibit 4-Agex Interpleader Filing-Amended Answer, Counterclaims, #6 Exhibit 5-Second Amended Petition, #7 Exhibit 6-Original Petition in Intervention, #8 Exhibit 7-Request for Citation, #9 Exhibit 8-10/1/19 Order, #10 Exhibit 9-Original Third Party Petition, #11 Exhibit 10-3/28/19 Letter to Pak Quality Foods, #12 Exhibit 11-Service Agreement AGEX/7SPacking LLC, #13 Exhibit 12-7/19/19 Submission of Agreed Order, #14 Exhibit 13-TBD Rejection) (Brooks, Keefe)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Orleans International, Inc. (Cwagenberg, Philip)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Cwagenberg on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Cwagenberg, Philip)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by 7S Packing, LLC (Brooks, Keefe)
September 17, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 7S Packing, LLC from Oakland, case number 2019-175959-CB. Receipt No: 0645-7407082 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Brooks, Keefe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orleans International, Inc. v. 7S Packing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orleans International, Inc.
Represented By: Philip Cwagenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7S Packing, LLC
Represented By: Keefe A. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?