PYSCHER et al v. PAREDES et al
Plaintiff: MARK PYSCHER and ANALESIA PYSCHER
Defendant: AMERICA PAREDES, LYNETTE PEPPLE and JOSE PAREDES
Case Number: 2:2019cv12744
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #11 Answer to Complaint Response to Affirmative Defenses by ANALESIA PYSCHER, MARK PYSCHER. (Cabot, Shawn)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker (RLou)
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by AMERICA PAREDES, JOSE PAREDES. (Gibbs, Gregory)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #9 Answer to Complaint Response to Affirmative Defenses by ANALESIA PYSCHER, MARK PYSCHER. (Cabot, Shawn)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by LYNETTE PEPPLE. (Mullins, Timothy)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Allow Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. (Responsive Pleading due by 10/11/2019). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alec S. Gibbs appearing on behalf of AMERICA PAREDES, JOSE PAREDES (Gibbs, Alec)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gregory T. Gibbs appearing on behalf of AMERICA PAREDES, JOSE PAREDES (Gibbs, Gregory)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ann A. Lerche appearing on behalf of AMERICA PAREDES, JOSE PAREDES (Lerche, Ann)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Regarding Removal. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Shawn C. Cabot appearing on behalf of ANALESIA PYSCHER, MARK PYSCHER (Cabot, Shawn)
September 20, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Miller on behalf of LYNETTE PEPPLE. (Miller, John)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LYNETTE PEPPLE from GENESEE CIRCUIT, case number 19-113079-CZ. Receipt No: 0645-7411959 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit COMPLAINT) (Mullins, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PYSCHER et al v. PAREDES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK PYSCHER
Represented By: Shawn C. Cabot
Represented By: Christopher J. Trainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANALESIA PYSCHER
Represented By: Shawn C. Cabot
Represented By: Christopher J. Trainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICA PAREDES
Represented By: Ann A. Lerche
Represented By: Alec S. Gibbs
Represented By: Gregory T. Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYNETTE PEPPLE
Represented By: John L. Miller
Represented By: Timothy J. Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE PAREDES
Represented By: Ann A. Lerche
Represented By: Alec S. Gibbs
Represented By: Gregory T. Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?