United States of America v. Eighty-Four Thousand Five Hundred Eighty-Seven Dollars ($84,587.00) in U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Eighty-Four Thousand Five Hundred Eighty-Seven Dollars ($84,587.00) in U.S. Currency, One Thousand Forty-Nine (1,049) Electronic Items and Accessories, Including, Without Limitation, Cell Phones, Tablets, Laptops, Desktop Computers, Cameras, Thermostats, Security Systems, Keyboards, He, Twenty-Five Thousand Nine Hundred Sixty-Five Dollars and Eighty-Four Cents ($25,965.84) in U.S. Currency from New Horizons Credit Union Account Number xxxxx3059, Two Hundred Forty-Six Thousand Five Hundred Fifty-Four Dollars and Eighty-Six Cents ($246,554.86) in U.S. Currency from JPMorgan Chase Bank Account Number xxxxxxxxxxx1373 and Sixty Thousand Dollars ($60,000.00) in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Prime Cellular Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv12944
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
2 Judge: Bernard A Friedman
3 Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanne M. Cors on behalf of Prime Cellular Solutions, Inc.. (Cors, Jeanne)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 CLAIM by Prime Cellular Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Receipts for Seized Assets) (Rogers, Gregory)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Bernard A. Friedman and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti to District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (NAhm)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Warrant Issued, #2 Warrant Issued, #3 Warrant Issued, #4 Warrant Issued, #1 Complaint,, #5 Warrant Issued by United States of America (Dydell, Adriana)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm)
October 9, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE filed by United States of America against All Defendants. No summons requested. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, 19-cr-20389, Judge Honorable Nancy G. Edmunds] (Dydell, Adriana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Eighty-Four Thousand Five Hundred Eighty-Seven Dollars ($84,587.00) in U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eighty-Four Thousand Five Hundred Eighty-Seven Dollars ($84,587.00) in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Thousand Forty-Nine (1,049) Electronic Items and Accessories, Including, Without Limitation, Cell Phones, Tablets, Laptops, Desktop Computers, Cameras, Thermostats, Security Systems, Keyboards, He
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twenty-Five Thousand Nine Hundred Sixty-Five Dollars and Eighty-Four Cents ($25,965.84) in U.S. Currency from New Horizons Credit Union Account Number xxxxx3059
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Hundred Forty-Six Thousand Five Hundred Fifty-Four Dollars and Eighty-Six Cents ($246,554.86) in U.S. Currency from JPMorgan Chase Bank Account Number xxxxxxxxxxx1373
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sixty Thousand Dollars ($60,000.00) in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Adriana Dydell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Prime Cellular Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory P. Rogers
Represented By: Jeanne M. Cors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?