Sure Express, LLC v. Amazon.Com Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sure Express, LLC
Defendant: Amazon.Com Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv12999
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Anthony P Patti
Referring Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/29/2020, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 7/31/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 10:00 AM before District Judge George Caram Steeh, Jury Trial set for 12/1/2020 at 9:00 AM before District Judge George Caram Steeh. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (Refer to image for additional dates) (BSau)
December 2, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge George Caram Steeh: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 12/2/2019. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (BSau)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Norton, Drew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/2019 11:00 AM before District Judge George Caram Steeh Discovery Plan due 11/25/19 (MBea)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Capuzzi on behalf of Amazon.Com Services, Inc.. (Capuzzi, Kevin)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Satisfying Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Amazon.Com Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Change, #2 Exhibit Corporate Summary) (Zalud, Eric)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Amazon.Com Services, Inc. to Show Cause within 10 days why case should not be remanded. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Amazon.Com Services, Inc.. (Zalud, Eric)
October 11, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Amazon.Com Services, Inc. (Zalud, Eric)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amazon.Com Services, Inc. from Circuit Court of Wayne County, case number 19-012204-CB. Receipt No: 0645-7441033 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Document Continuation Certificate of Service, #3 Document Continuation Civil Cover Sheet) (Zalud, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sure Express, LLC v. Amazon.Com Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sure Express, LLC
Represented By: Drew Stewart Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com Services, Inc.
Represented By: Eric L. Zalud
Represented By: Kevin M. Capuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?