Derrick v. Isabella County Trial Court et al
Plaintiff: Cory O'dell Derrick
Defendant: Mark H. Duthie and Isabella County Trial Court
Case Number: 2:2019cv13123
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Order Dismissing Case, #7 Judgment on Cory O'dell Derrick Pris. No. 103943 at Isabella County Jail, 207 Court St. A, Mt. Pleasant, MI 48858. (LVer)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Summary Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $0 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SOso)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Mediation Program (AFla)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Cory O'dell Derrick. (AFla)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Cory O'dell Derrick against Mark H. Duthie, Isabella County Trial Court (AFla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Derrick v. Isabella County Trial Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory O'dell Derrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark H. Duthie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabella County Trial Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?