Aghachi v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Chibuikem Aghachi
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, Acting Dir. of USCIS Ken Cuccinelli, Acting Secretary KEVIN K. McALEENAN, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, District Director Mirash "Mick" Dedvukaj and Field Office Directo MICHAEL KLINGER
Case Number: 2:2019cv13143
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
December 9, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Ken Cuccinelli, Mirash "Mick" Dedvukaj, MICHAEL KLINGER, KEVIN K. McALEENAN, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security (Dodge, Lynn)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 10/28/2019. (Birach, Robert)[PROOF OF MAILING] Modified on 10/30/2019 (DPer).
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 10/28/2019. (Birach, Robert)[PROOF OF MAILING] Modified on 10/30/2019 (DPer).
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Mirash Dedvukaj served on 10/28/2019. (Birach, Robert)[PROOF OF MAILING] Modified on 10/30/2019 (DPer).
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Michael Klinger served on 10/28/2019. (Birach, Robert)[PROOF OF MAILING] Modified on 10/30/2019 (DPer).
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kevin McAleenan served on 10/28/2019. (Birach, Robert)[PROOF OF MAILING] Modified on 10/30/2019 (DPer).
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ken Cuccinelli served on 10/28/2019. (Birach, Robert)[PROOF OF MAILING] Modified on 10/30/2019 (DPer).
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of All Defendants. (Birach, Robert)[PROOF OF MAILING] Modified on 10/30/2019 (DPer).
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney General served on 10/28/2019. (Birach, Robert)[PROOF OF MAILING] Modified on 10/30/2019 (DPer).
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (DPer)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DPer)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus filed by Chibuikem Aghachi against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7460954 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I-130 Approval Notice, #2 Exhibit Cover Letter for I-212, #3 Exhibit "Direct Filing Addresses for Form I-212" from uscis.gov, #4 Exhibit Copy of G-28, Notice of Entry of Appearance as Attorney, #5 Exhibit USCIS EFRS Transaction Notice, #6 Exhibit Letter to USCIS Detroit, dated 08/06/2019, #7 Exhibit Affidavit of Connie J. Cannon, #8 Exhibit Letter to USCIS Detroit, dated 09/30/2019, #9 Index of Exhibits) (Birach, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aghachi v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Dir. of USCIS Ken Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary KEVIN K. McALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director Mirash "Mick" Dedvukaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Directo MICHAEL KLINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chibuikem Aghachi
Represented By: Robert M. Birach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?