Adelson [E-FILER] v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wendy B. Adelson [E-FILER]
Defendant: Trott Law, P.C., HSBC Bank USA N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Michael McDermott, Heidi Mysazk and ACE Securities Corp Home
Case Number: 2:2019cv13208
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from Oakland County Circuit Court of receipt of #12 Notice of Remand. (DPer)
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE remanding case to Oakland County Circuit Court. (NAhm)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REMANDING CASE to Oakland County County Circuit Court. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (NAhm)
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Adelson [E-FILER], Wendy)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Wendy B. Adelson [E-FILER] served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (Adelson [E-FILER], Wendy)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Adelson [E-FILER], Wendy)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Adelson [E-FILER], Wendy)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Wendy B. Adelson [E-FILER] served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Adelson [E-FILER], Wendy)
November 4, 2019 Pro Se E-filing Account Created for Wendy B. Adelson [E-FILER]. (NAhm)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 Pro Se Application for E-filing submitted by Wendy B. Adelson [E-FILER]. [APPROVED] (NAhm) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/4/2019) (NAhm).
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 EX-PARTE EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order for Equitable Extension of the Redemptions Period by Wendy B. Adelson [E-FILER]. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (NAhm)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wendy B. Adelson [E-FILER] from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2019-177453-CH. Receipt No: DET126360 - Fee: $ 400 (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation, #3 Document Continuation, #4 Document Continuation) (NAhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adelson [E-FILER] v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trott Law, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Mysazk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE Securities Corp Home
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy B. Adelson [E-FILER]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?