Withrow et al v. FCA US LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Jeff Withrow and Kevin Nestor
Defendant: FCA NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS, LLC, FIAT CHRYSLER AUTOMOBILES, N.V., FCA US LLC, F/K/A CHRYSLER GROUP, A DELAWARE CORPORATION and FCA US LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv13214
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kevin Nestor, Jeff Withrow as to FCA NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS, LLC and FIAT CHRYSLER AUTOMOBILES, N.V. WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Hilliard, Robert)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas J. Murray appearing on behalf of FCA NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS, LLC, FCA US LLC (Murray, Thomas)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATED ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendants FCA US LLC and FCA North America Holdings LLC to Respond to Class Action Complaint. (Response due by 1/27/2020) Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas L. Azar, Jr appearing on behalf of FCA NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS, LLC, FCA US LLC (Azar, Thomas)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephen A. D'Aunoy appearing on behalf of FCA NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS, LLC, FCA US LLC (D'Aunoy, Stephen)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kathy A. Wisniewski appearing on behalf of FCA NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS, LLC, FCA US LLC (Wisniewski, Kathy)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *FCA NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS, LLC* (DPer)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *FIAT CHRYSLER AUTOMOBILES, N.V.* (DPer)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *FCA US LLC* (DPer)
November 1, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jeff Withrow, Kevin Nestor against Jeff Withrow, Kevin Nestor with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7469553 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Fairfield - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 5:19-cv-12365-JEL-APP, Judge Judge Judith E. Levy] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet) (Hilliard, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Withrow et al v. FCA US LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Thomas J. Murray
Represented By: Stephen A. D'Aunoy
Represented By: Kathy A. Wisniewski
Represented By: Thomas L. Azar, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIAT CHRYSLER AUTOMOBILES, N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC, F/K/A CHRYSLER GROUP, A DELAWARE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Thomas J. Murray
Represented By: Stephen A. D'Aunoy
Represented By: Kathy A. Wisniewski
Represented By: Thomas L. Azar, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Withrow
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Nestor
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?