Richards v. Warren Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Richards
Defendant: Warren Police Department and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2019cv13224
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David M Lawson
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #13 Attorney Appearance by All Defendants (Salhaney, Michael)
December 27, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by All Defendants (Salhaney, Michael)
December 27, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants. (Salhaney, Michael)
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael P. Salhaney appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Salhaney, Michael)
December 10, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #12 Order on Kevin Richards 537199, PARNALL CORRECTIONAL FACILITY - SMT, 1780 E. PARNALL, JACKSON, MI 49201. (SPin)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying #11 Request to Add Names of "John Doe" Defendants to Documents Relating to Service of Process. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
December 5, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #10 Acknowledgment on Kevin Richards 537199, PARNALL CORRECTIONAL FACILITY - SMT, 1780 E. PARNALL, JACKSON, MI 49201. (SPin)
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents. (SPin)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 Letter re: John Doe Defendants from Kevin Richards (SSch)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
November 7, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Order on Petition/Request/Application, #8 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge, #5 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #7 Directing Service by the US Marshal on Kevin Richards 537199, PARNALL CORRECTIONAL FACILITY - SMT, 1780 E. PARNALL, JACKSON, MI 49201. (SPin)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying #3 Application filed by Kevin Richards for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Mediation Program (AFla)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Kevin Richards. (AFla)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Kevin Richards. (AFla)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kevin Richards against John Doe, Warren Police Department (AFla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richards v. Warren Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Police Department
Represented By: Michael P. Salhaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Michael P. Salhaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?