American Center for Pain Management v. Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: American Center for Pain Management
Defendant: Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv13260
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/20/2020, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 8/3/2020, Final Settlement Conference set for 12/7/2020 at 03:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith, Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/4/2021 at 03:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith, and Jury Trial set for 1/19/2021 08:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Refer to image for additional dates) (Sandusky, K)
December 19, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 12/19/2019. (Sandusky, K)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Coote, Ian)
December 5, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2019 04:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (TIME CHANGE ONLY). Attorney for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and then include the Court when all parties are available by calling 313/234-5240 (Sandusky, K)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Regarding Telephonic Scheduling Conference ( TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 03:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith). Attorney for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and then include the Court when all parties are available by calling 313/234-5240. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Peters, Kevin)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Regarding Removal #1 . Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
November 6, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2019-176401-NF. Receipt No: 0645-7475076 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Peters, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Center for Pain Management v. Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Center for Pain Management
Represented By: Kevin S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin J. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?