Harkous v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Najah Harkous
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Case Number: 2:2019cv13290
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for *Social Security Administration, Commissioner of* (KBro)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR IMPORTANT INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (THac)
November 23, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Najah Harkous. (Jamula, Jennifer)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 11/25/2019 (ATee)
November 8, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Referral of Social Security Case to Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (DAll)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD of ALJ Hearing proceedings by Najah Harkous (Jamula, Jennifer)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Najah Harkous against Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. Plaintiff requests summons issued. IFP Application to Follow. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IFP) (Jamula, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harkous v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Najah Harkous
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Jamula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?