Grech v. Ditech Financial LLC et al
Plaintiff: John Grech
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae) and Ditech Financial LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv13291
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 1/15/2020 10:30 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #3 Order Regarding Removal by Ditech Financial LLC. (Krause, Courtney)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Ditech Financial LLC. (Krause, Courtney)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Ditech Financial LLC identifying Corporate Parent Walter Investment Management Corp. for Ditech Financial LLC. (Krause, Courtney)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Ditech Financial LLC of Bankruptcy Status (Krause, Courtney)
November 8, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ditech Financial LLC from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 19-013232-CH. Receipt No: 0645-7478939 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Krause, Courtney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grech v. Ditech Financial LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC
Represented By: Courtney A. Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Grech
Represented By: Valerie A. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?