Priorities USA v. Nessel
Plaintiff: Priorities USA
Defendant: Dana Nessel
Case Number: 2:2019cv13341
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
January 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Hamilton on behalf of Priorities USA. (Hamilton, Kevin)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Regarding Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting Defendant's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Dkt. #9 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Dana Nessel. (Meingast, Heather)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Dismiss by Dana Nessel. (Meingast, Heather)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Erik A. Grill appearing on behalf of Dana Nessel (Grill, Erik)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Heather S. Meingast appearing on behalf of Dana Nessel (Meingast, Heather)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Priorities USA served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (Elias, Marc)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc E. Elias on behalf of Priorities USA. (Elias, Marc)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Dana Nessel* (LGra)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs (Prescott, Sarah)
November 13, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7483386 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Prescott, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Priorities USA v. Nessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priorities USA
Represented By: Sarah Prescott
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Nessel
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Represented By: Erik A. Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?