Brown v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Roderick Brown [E-Filer]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, National Association, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, Randall S. Miller & Associates, P.C. and United Agent Group Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv13356
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Sean F Cox
2 Judge: Denise Page Hood
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12b(6) for Failure To State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Randall S. Miller & Associates, P.C.'s Motion to Dismis filed by Roderick Brown [E-Filer]. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Email from Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Letters from Randall S. Miller & Associates, P.C., #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Letters to Randall S. Miller & Associates, P.C., #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Documentation from Randall S. Miller & Associates, P.C., #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Specialized Loan Servicing LLC Letters, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F - Letters and Emails from The Parratt Team, LLC, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G - Letters and Email Communications, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H - Letter from The Parrott Team, LLC, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I - Harassment and Defamation Information) (Brown [E-Filer], Roderick)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint filed by HSBC Bank USA, National Association, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
January 9, 2020 Filing 25 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #24 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by HSBC Bank USA, National Association, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Report and Recommendation - ECF No. 26, #2 Exhibit B - Report and Recommendation - ECF No. 149, #3 Exhibit C - R. Brown's Letter to SLS dated 7-3-2019, #4 Exhibit D - SLS' Response Letter to Plaintiff dated 8-2-2019) (Mountford, Derek)
January 9, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by HSBC Bank USA, National Association, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Mountford, Derek)
December 27, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response re #15 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT RANDALL S. MILLER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. AND STRIKE NOTICES OF APPEARANCES ECF NO. 6 AND ECF NO. 8 PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANT RANDALL S. MILLER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL FOR RANDALL S. MILLER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. AND TO STRIKE NOTICES OF APPEARANCES ECF NO. 6 AND ECF NO. 8 filed by Roderick Brown [E-Filer]. (Brown [E-Filer], Roderick)
December 26, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response re #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Notice of Appearance, #6 Notice of Appearance, #15 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT RANDALL S. MILLER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. AND STR, #9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12b(6) for Failure To State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANT RANDALL S. MILLER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Roderick Brown [E-Filer]. (Brown [E-Filer], Roderick)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Denise Page Hood to District Judge Sean F. Cox. (NAhm)
December 20, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Notice of Appearance, #6 Notice of Appearance, #15 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT RANDALL S. MILLER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. AND STR filed by Randall S. Miller & Associates, P.C.. (Scodeller, Raymond)
December 20, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT RANDALL S. MILLER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. AND STRIKE NOTICES OF APPEARANCES ECF NO. 6 AND ECF NO. 8 filed by Randall S. Miller & Associates, P.C.. (Scodeller, Raymond)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Vacating #17 Order to Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute,. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER for Plaintiff(s) to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute as to defendant United Agent Group Inc. Show Cause Response due by 1/3/2020 Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
December 12, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Notice of Appearance, #6 Notice of Appearance, #15 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT RANDALL S. MILLER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. AND STRIKE NOTICES OF APPEARANCES ECF NO. 6 AND ECF NO. 8, #9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12b(6) for Failure To State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT RANDALL S. MILLER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. by Roderick Brown [E-Filer]. (Brown [E-Filer], Roderick)
December 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT RANDALL S. MILLER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. AND STRIKE NOTICES OF APPEARANCES ECF NO. 6 AND ECF NO. 8 by Roderick Brown [E-Filer]. (Brown [E-Filer], Roderick)
December 10, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC AND HSBC BANK, N.A., AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE FOR THE FBR SECURITIZATION TRUST 2005-2 CALLABLE MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTE, SERIES 2005-2 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT filed by Roderick Brown [E-Filer]. (Brown [E-Filer], Roderick)
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by HSBC Bank USA, National Association, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Mountford, Derek)
December 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO COMPLY with Local Rule 5.1.1 issued to Roderick Brown (pro-se filer) re #11 Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed. (DPer)
December 9, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. HSBC Bank USA, National Association served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019; Randall S. Miller & Associates, P.C. served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019; Specialized Loan Servicing LLC served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019; United Agent Group Inc. served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (DPer)
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Strike #5 Answer to Complaint PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS UNITED AGENT GROUP INC. ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AS NONRESPONSIVE by Roderick Brown [E-Filer]. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Brown [E-Filer], Roderick)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12b(6) for Failure To State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by Randall S. Miller & Associates, P.C.. (Scodeller, Raymond)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary K. Thieme on behalf of Randall S. Miller & Associates, P.C.. (Thieme, Mary)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Randall S. Miller & Associates, P.C. identifying Corporate Parent Randall Miller & Associates, P.C. for Randall S. Miller & Associates, P.C.. (Scodeller, Raymond)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond H. K. Scodeller on behalf of Randall S. Miller & Associates, P.C.. (Scodeller, Raymond)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by United Agent Group Inc.. (SSch)
November 14, 2019 Pro Se E-filing Account Created for Roderick Brown [E-Filer]. (NAhm)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 Pro Se Application for E-filing submitted by Roderick Brown [E-Filer]. [APPROVED] (NAhm)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *HSBC Bank USA, National Association, Randall S. Miller & Associates, P.C., Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, United Agent Group Inc.* (DPer)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Roderick Brown against defendants; Receipt No: 126690 - Fee: $ 400. (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Represented By: Derek K. Mountford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Derek K. Mountford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall S. Miller & Associates, P.C.
Represented By: Raymond H. K. Scodeller
Represented By: Mary K. Thieme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Agent Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Brown [E-Filer]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?