Glover et al v. Rivas et al
Plaintiff: Tina Glover, R. G. and Richard Glover
Defendant: Michael Kennedy, Stacey Purdy, Nurse Bills, Linnie Brooks, Ne'tesha Demyers, Gordon Hill, Nicole Pitcher, Joel Salinas, William Marsh, Kevin Lindsey, Jeffrey Utter, Officer Snyder, Jeremy Howard, Jennifer Norder, Vincent Rickman, Jennifer Sierminski, Monica Rivas, Christine McCumber-Hemry, Valerie Lashley, Ale Schneider, Paul Anderson, Noah Nagy, Nicholas Kik, Devin Freymuth, Sergeant Reynolds, Brian Madery, Tarhaka McElroy, William Hokanson, Samuel Delossantos, Joseph Iosefa, James King, Shawn Brewer, Marvin Moseley, Douglas Smith, Kimberly Napier, Shane Rennells, Victoria Hallet, Karina Blair, Jay Cooley, Michael Demps, Jennifer Crane, Patricia Rogers, Sheryl Bailey, Ernest Pazitka, Khris Nevins, Keara Muzzin, Crystal Brown, Chris Knapp, Jacquelyn Thelen, Britancia Doss and Gregory Gordon
Case Number: 2:2019cv13406
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Michael J Hluchaniuk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Jennifer Norder served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019; Jeffrey Utter served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Return of Service for Jeffrey Utter) (Radner, Solomon)
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Miscellaneous Hearing set for 1/22/2020 10:30 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu)
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email chain) (Radner, Solomon)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Nicole Pitcher served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Radner, Solomon)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Paul Anderson, Sheryl Bailey, Shawn Brewer, Crystal Brown, Jay Cooley, Jennifer Crane, Samuel Delossantos, Michael Demps, Britancia Doss, Devin Freymuth, Gordon Hill, Jeremy Howard, Joseph Iosefa, Michael Kennedy, Nicholas Kik, James King, Chris Knapp, Valerie Lashley, Brian Madery, William Marsh, Christine McCumber-Hemry, Tarhaka McElroy, Marvin Moseley, Keara Muzzin, Noah Nagy, Kimberly Napier, Jennifer Norder, Ernest Pazitka, Stacey Purdy, Shane Rennells, Sergeant Reynolds, Vincent Rickman, Patricia Rogers, Joel Salinas, Officer Snyder, Jacquelyn Thelen. (Farrell, James)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Sheryl Bailey served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019; Nurse Bills served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019; Victoria Hallet served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019; Ale Schneider served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019; Douglas Smith served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation, #3 Document Continuation, #4 Document Continuation) (Radner, Solomon)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Paul Anderson served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Shawn Brewer served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Linnie Brooks served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Crystal Brown served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Jay Cooley served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Jennifer Crane served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Samuel Delossantos served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Michael Demps served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Ne'tesha Demyers served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Britancia Doss served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Devin Freymuth served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Gordon Hill served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; William Hokanson served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Jeremy Howard served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Joseph Iosefa served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Michael Kennedy served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Nicholas Kik served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; James King served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Chris Knapp served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Valerie Lashley served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Brian Madery served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; William Marsh served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Christine McCumber-Hemry served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Tarhaka McElroy served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Marvin Moseley served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Keara Muzzin served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Noah Nagy served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Kimberly Napier served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Jennifer Norder served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Ernest Pazitka served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Stacey Purdy served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Shane Rennells served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Sergeant Reynolds served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Monica Rivas served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Patricia Rogers served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Joel Salinas served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Jennifer Sierminski served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Officer Snyder served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; Jacquelyn Thelen served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation, #3 Document Continuation, #4 Document Continuation, #5 Document Continuation, #6 Document Continuation, #7 Document Continuation, #8 Document Continuation, #9 Document Continuation, #10 Document Continuation, #11 Document Continuation, #12 Document Continuation, #13 Document Continuation, #14 Document Continuation, #15 Document Continuation, #16 Document Continuation, #17 Document Continuation, #18 Document Continuation, #19 Document Continuation, #20 Document Continuation, #21 Document Continuation, #22 Document Continuation, #23 Document Continuation, #24 Document Continuation, #25 Document Continuation, #26 Document Continuation, #27 Document Continuation, #28 Document Continuation, #29 Document Continuation, #30 Document Continuation, #31 Document Continuation, #32 Document Continuation, #33 Document Continuation, #34 Document Continuation, #35 Document Continuation, #36 Document Continuation, #37 Document Continuation, #38 Document Continuation) (Radner, Solomon)
November 19, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Paul Anderson, Sheryl Bailey, Nurse Bills, Karina Blair, Shawn Brewer, Linnie Brooks, Crystal Brown, Jay Cooley, Jennifer Crane, Samuel Delossantos, Michael Demps, Ne'tesha Demyers, Britancia Doss, Devin Freymuth, Gregory Gordon, Victoria Hallet, Gordon Hill, William Hokanson, Jeremy Howard, Joseph Iosefa, Michael Kennedy, Nicholas Kik, James King, Chris Knapp, Valerie Lashley, Kevin Lindsey, Brian Madery, William Marsh, Christine McCumber-Hemry, Tarhaka McElroy, Marvin Moseley, Keara Muzzin, Noah Nagy, Kimberly Napier, Khris Nevins, Jennifer Norder, Ernest Pazitka, Nicole Pitcher, Stacey Purdy, Shane Rennells, Sergeant Reynolds, Vincent Rickman, Monica Rivas, Patricia Rogers, Joel Salinas, Ale Schneider, Jennifer Sierminski, Douglas Smith, Officer Snyder, Jacquelyn Thelen, Jeffrey Utter* (DAll)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Tina Glover, Richard Glover, R. G. against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7491439 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Jackson - County Where Action Arose: Jackson - County of 1st Defendant: Jackson. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Radner, Solomon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glover et al v. Rivas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kennedy
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Purdy
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Bills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linnie Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ne'tesha Demyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Hill
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Pitcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Salinas
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Marsh
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Utter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Snyder
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Howard
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Norder
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Rickman
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Sierminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine McCumber-Hemry
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Lashley
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ale Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Anderson
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noah Nagy
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Kik
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Freymuth
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Reynolds
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Madery
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarhaka McElroy
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hokanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Delossantos
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Iosefa
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James King
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Brewer
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Moseley
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Napier
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Rennells
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Hallet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karina Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Cooley
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Demps
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Crane
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Rogers
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl Bailey
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Pazitka
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khris Nevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keara Muzzin
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Brown
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Knapp
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacquelyn Thelen
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Britancia Doss
Represented By: James T. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Glover
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. G.
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Glover
Represented By: Solomon M. Radner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?