General Motors LLC et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: General Motors LLC and General Motors Company
Defendant: Michael Brown, Alphons Iacobelli, Jerome Durden, FCA US LLC and Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.
Interested Party: International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace, and Agricultural Implement Workers of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv13429
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Paul D Borman
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Filing 55 (1)DENYING #31 PLAINTIFF GENERAL MOTORS' MOTION TO ENFORCE FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26(d)(1) AND THE COURT'S PRACTICE REQUIREMENTS REGARDING DISCOVERY AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS, SIGNIFICANT NON-PARTIES AND OTHER ENTITIES (2)REQUESTING BRIEFING CONCERNING PLAINTIFF GENERAL MOTORS' CONCERNS ABOUT PRESERVATION OF EVIDENCE IN THE POSSESSION OR CONTROL OF THIRD-PARTY UNITED AUTO WORKERS. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #45 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
February 5, 2020 Filing 53 AMENDED #48 Response to Motion, by International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace, and Agricultural Implement Workers of America (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Jeffrey D. Sodko, Esq. in Support of UAW's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Rule 26(d)(1), #3 Exhibit Unpublished Cases) (Carter, Abigail)
February 5, 2020 Filing 52 REPLY to Response re #31 MOTION to Enforce Rule 26(d)(1) and the Court's Practice Requirements Regarding Discovery filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Index of Exhibits Appendix of Unpublished Authorities, #9 Exhibit Unpublished Authorities) (Lamb, Jeffrey)
February 4, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Joinder/Concurrence in #40 Response to Motion, filed by FCA US LLC, Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V. by Michael Brown (Gonek, Ben)
February 3, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss by Alphons Iacobelli. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Unreported Cases) (Nedelman, Michael)
January 31, 2020 Filing 49 REPLY to Response re #31 MOTION to Enforce Rule 26(d)(1) and the Court's Practice Requirements Regarding Discovery filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Index of Exhibits Appendix of Unpublished Authorities, #5 Exhibit Unpublished Authorities) (Lamb, Jeffrey)
January 30, 2020 Filing 48 RESPONSE to #31 MOTION to Enforce Rule 26(d)(1) and the Court's Practice Requirements Regarding Discovery filed by International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace, and Agricultural Implement Workers of America. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1: Declaration of Jeffrey D. Sodko, Esq. in Support of UAW's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Rule 26(d)(1), #3 Exhibit 2: Unpublished Authorities) (Carter, Abigail)
January 30, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail V. Carter on behalf of International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace, and Agricultural Implement Workers of America. (Carter, Abigail)
January 29, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Willian on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Willian, Jeffrey)
January 28, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney and Certificate of Service David DuMouchel and Damien DuMouchel of Butzel Long by Alphons Iacobelli. (DuMouchel, David)
January 27, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Joinder/Concurrence in #41 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by FCA US LLC by Jerome Durden (Gracey, Judith)
January 24, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Joinder/Concurrence in #41 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by FCA US LLC by Michael Brown (Gonek, Ben)
January 24, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Unpublished Cases) (Holley, Steven)
January 24, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Presentation, #3 Exhibit Presentation, #4 Exhibit Article, #5 Exhibit Article, #6 Exhibit Article, #7 Exhibit Article, #8 Exhibit Unpublished Cases) (Holley, Steven)
January 24, 2020 Filing 40 RESPONSE to #31 MOTION to Enforce Rule 26(d)(1) and the Court's Practice Requirements Regarding Discovery filed by FCA US LLC, Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Pl Requests for Production of Documents to FCA, #3 Exhibit Pl Requests for Production of Documents to Fiat, #4 Exhibit Pl First Interrogatories to Fiat, #5 Exhibit Unpublished Cases) (Holley, Steven)
January 24, 2020 Filing 39 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Lamb, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Joinder/Concurrence in #37 Response to Motion filed by Alphons Iacobelli by Jerome Durden (Gracey, Judith)
January 24, 2020 Filing 37 RESPONSE to #31 MOTION to Enforce Rule 26(d)(1) and the Court's Practice Requirements Regarding Discovery filed by Alphons Iacobelli. (Nedelman, Michael)
January 17, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Hariklia Karis on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Karis, Hariklia)
January 16, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Porpora on behalf of FCA US LLC, Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.. (Porpora, Matthew)
January 15, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Joinder/Concurrence in #32 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by FCA US LLC, Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V. by Jerome Durden (Gracey, Judith)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting in part #32 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
January 14, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by FCA US LLC, Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Holley, Steven)
January 10, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Enforce Rule 26(d)(1) and the Court's Practice Requirements Regarding Discovery by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Index of Exhibits Appendix of Unpublished Authorities, #11 Exhibit Unpublished Authorities) (Lamb, Jeffrey)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant Michael Brown to File Responsive Pleading re #1 Complaint,, filed by General Motors LLC, General Motors Company. Response due by 1/24/2020 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
January 8, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Ben M. Gonek on behalf of Michael Brown. (Gonek, Ben)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant Durden to File Responsive Pleading re #1 Complaint,, filed by General Motors LLC, General Motors Company. Response due by 2/3/2020 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant Iacobelli to File Responsive Pleading re #1 Complaint,, filed by General Motors LLC, General Motors Company. Response due by 2/3/2020 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
December 20, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Damien P. DuMouchel on behalf of Alphons Iacobelli. (DuMouchel, Damien)
December 20, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by David F. DuMouchel on behalf of Alphons Iacobelli. (DuMouchel, David)
December 20, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Nedelman on behalf of Alphons Iacobelli. (Nedelman, Michael)
December 18, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Judith S. Gracey appearing on behalf of Jerome Durden (Gracey, Judith)
December 18, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L. Holley on behalf of Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.. (Holley, Steven)
December 18, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Eden Cohen on behalf of Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.. (Cohen, Jacob)
December 18, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Allen on behalf of Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.. (Allen, Matthew)
December 18, 2019 Filing 19 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V. identifying Corporate Parent CNH Industrial N.V., Corporate Parent Exor N.V., Corporate Parent Ferrari N.V., Corporate Parent Juventus Football Club for Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.. (Cranmer, Thomas)
December 18, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Cranmer on behalf of Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.. (Cranmer, Thomas)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading re #1 Complaint,, filed by General Motors LLC, General Motors Company. Response due by 1/24/2020 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Alphons Iacobelli served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Wenner, Adam)
December 6, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Jerome Durden served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (Wenner, Adam)
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by FCA US LLC identifying Corporate Parent Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V. for FCA US LLC. (Cranmer, Thomas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L. Holley on behalf of FCA US LLC. (Holley, Steven)
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Eden Cohen on behalf of FCA US LLC. (Cohen, Jacob)
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Allen on behalf of FCA US LLC. (Allen, Matthew)
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Cranmer on behalf of FCA US LLC. (Cranmer, Thomas)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Michael Huget on behalf of General Motors Company, General Motors LLC. (Huget, J.)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Shirin S. Goyal appearing on behalf of General Motors Company, General Motors LLC (Goyal, Shirin)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Adam Michael Wenner appearing on behalf of General Motors Company, General Motors LLC (Wenner, Adam)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Michael Brown served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Lamb, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. FCA US LLC served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Lamb, Jeffrey)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Michael Brown, Jerome Durden, FCA US LLC, Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V., Alphons Iacobelli* (DAll)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by General Motors LLC (Lamb, Jeffrey)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by General Motors Company (Lamb, Jeffrey)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7494511 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 17-cr-20406-PDB-RSW, Judge Paul D. Borman] (Lamb, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Motors LLC et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Brown
Represented By: Ben M. Gonek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphons Iacobelli
Represented By: Michael A. Nedelman
Represented By: David F. DuMouchel
Represented By: Damien P. DuMouchel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Durden
Represented By: Judith S. Gracey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Porpora
Represented By: Steven L. Holley
Represented By: Jacob Eden Cohen
Represented By: Matthew P. Allen
Represented By: Thomas W. Cranmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.
Represented By: Matthew J. Porpora
Represented By: Steven L. Holley
Represented By: Jacob Eden Cohen
Represented By: Matthew P. Allen
Represented By: Thomas W. Cranmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Lamb
Represented By: J. Michael Huget
Represented By: Hariklia Karis
Represented By: Adam Michael Wenner
Represented By: Shirin S. Goyal
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Willian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Motors Company
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Lamb
Represented By: J. Michael Huget
Represented By: Hariklia Karis
Represented By: Adam Michael Wenner
Represented By: Shirin S. Goyal
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Willian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace, and Agricultural Implement Workers of America
Represented By: Abigail V. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?