Adelson v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wendy B. Adelson and Wendy B. Adelson [E-FILER]
Defendant: Michael McDermott, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Trott Law, P.C., Heidi Mysazk and HSBC BANK USA N.A., individually and as Trustee on behalf of ACE SECURITIES HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST SERIES 2007-HE1, ASSET BACKED PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES
Case Number: 2:2019cv13569
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Terrence G Berg
2 Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATED ORDER FOR EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
January 24, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua C. Castmore on behalf of Wendy B. Adelson [E-FILER]. (Castmore, Joshua)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to Respond re #10 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 1/31/2020 Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
December 24, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Extend Response Time by Wendy B. Adelson [E-FILER] (Adelson [E-FILER], Wendy)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Victoria A. Roberts to District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (NAhm)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by HSBC BANK USA N.A., individually and as Trustee on behalf of ACE SECURITIES HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST SERIES 2007-HE1, ASSET BACKED PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Notices of Adjournment, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Order, #4 Exhibit C - Unpublished Decisions) (Ramin, Nasseem)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to HSBC BANK USA N.A., individually and as Trustee on behalf of ACE SECURITIES HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST SERIES 2007-HE1, ASSET BACKED PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES by Wendy B. Adelson [E-FILER]. (Adelson [E-FILER], Wendy)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC by Wendy B. Adelson [E-FILER]. (Adelson [E-FILER], Wendy)
December 9, 2019 NOTICE of Error Wendy B. Adelson e-filer re #7 Request for Clerks Entry of Default, #6 Request for Clerks Entry of Default,. Fillable forms are blank. Please re-submit. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SSch)
December 7, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC by Wendy B. Adelson [E-FILER]. (Adelson [E-FILER], Wendy) Modified on 12/10/2019 (SSch). [DOCUMENT STILL FILLABLE]
December 7, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to HSBC BANK USA N.A., individually and as Trustee on behalf of ACE SECURITIES HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST SERIES 2007-HE1, ASSET BACKED PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES by Wendy B. Adelson [E-FILER]. (Adelson [E-FILER], Wendy) Modified on 12/10/2019 (SSch). [DOCUMENT STILL FILLABLE]
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Schehr on behalf of HSBC BANK USA N.A., individually and as Trustee on behalf of ACE SECURITIES HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST SERIES 2007-HE1, ASSET BACKED PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Schehr, Thomas)
December 5, 2019 Pro Se E-filing Account Created for Wendy B. Adelson [E-FILER]. (DPer)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 Pro Se Application for E-filing submitted by Wendy B. Adelson [APPROVED] (DPer)
December 4, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by HSBC BANK USA N.A., individually and as Trustee on behalf of ACE SECURITIES HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST SERIES 2007-HE1, ASSET BACKED PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Other Affiliate HSBC Holdings PLC for HSBC BANK USA N.A., individually and as Trustee on behalf of ACE SECURITIES HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST SERIES 2007-HE1, ASSET BACKED PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES. (Ramin, Nasseem)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by HSBC BANK USA N.A., individually and as Trustee on behalf of ACE SECURITIES HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST SERIES 2007-HE1, ASSET BACKED PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Other Affiliate PHH Mortgage Corporation, Other Affiliate PHH Corporation for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Ramin, Nasseem)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HSBC BANK USA N.A., individually and as Trustee on behalf of ACE SECURITIES HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST SERIES 2007-HE1, ASSET BACKED PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2019-177453-CH. Receipt No: 0645-7510259 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): US District Court Eastern District, 4:07-cv-13142, Judge Berg] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 2019 COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit B CONSENT TO REMOVAL) (Ramin, Nasseem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adelson v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Nasseem S. Ramin
Represented By: Thomas M. Schehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trott Law, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Mysazk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC BANK USA N.A., individually and as Trustee on behalf of ACE SECURITIES HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST SERIES 2007-HE1, ASSET BACKED PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES
Represented By: Nasseem S. Ramin
Represented By: Thomas M. Schehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy B. Adelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy B. Adelson [E-FILER]
Represented By: Joshua C. Castmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?