Joseph v. United States of America
Defendant: United States of America
Petitioner: raymond frank joseph
Case Number: 2:2019cv13583
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:7609
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
January 24, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal by raymond frank joseph (Thompson, William)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER for the Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Venar R. Ayar terminated. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER STRIKING #7 Stipulation filed by raymond frank joseph. See, R11 of the Electronic Filing Policies and Procedures for the EDMI, available as an Appendix to this District's Local Rules. Issued by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 [STRICKEN] STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel by raymond frank joseph (Thompson, William) Modified on 1/13/2020 (AChu).
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William L. Thompson on behalf of raymond frank joseph. (Thompson, William)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Newby on behalf of United States of America. (Newby, Jennifer)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Nemeth on behalf of raymond frank joseph. (Nemeth, Eric)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *United States of America* (RBog)
December 11, 2019 FILING FEE Received in the amount of $400 by raymond frank joseph - Receipt No. DET127411 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (RBog)
December 9, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 12/16/2019 (DAll)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION TO QUASH SUMMONS filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Fee Required - Fee Not Paid. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Ayar, Venar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: raymond frank joseph
Represented By: Venar R. Ayar
Represented By: William L. Thompson
Represented By: Eric Nemeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Jennifer L. Newby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?