Jenkins v. The United States of America
Plaintiff: Hosea Jenkins
Defendant: The United States of America d/b/a The Department of Veterans Affairs d/b/a John D Dingell VA Medical Center, James K Duncan DPM, Sunny Sajjad DPM, Toritsetse G Aniejurengho NP and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv13607
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER of substitution of defendant. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPer)
January 31, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by All Defendants NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A) Certification of Scope of Employment) (Anchill, Benjamin)
January 31, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin A. Anchill on behalf of Toritsetse G Aniejurengho NP, James K Duncan DPM, Sunny Sajjad DPM, The United States of America d/b/a The Department of Veterans Affairs d/b/a John D Dingell VA Medical Center. (Anchill, Benjamin)
January 15, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of The United States of America d/b/a The Department of Veterans Affairs d/b/a John D Dingell VA Medical Center served on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Certified Mail Receipt) (Mafrice, Frank)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Toritsetse G Aniejurengho NP served on 1/8/2020, answer due 1/29/2020. (Mafrice, Frank)
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. James K Duncan DPM served on 1/8/2020, answer due 1/29/2020. (Mafrice, Frank)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (DAll)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Sunny Sajjad DPM* (DAll)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *James K Duncan DPM* (DAll)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Toritsetse G Aniejurengho NP* (DAll)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *The United States of America d/b/a The Department of Veterans Affairs d/b/a John D Dingell VA Medical Center* (DAll)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 19-CV-13607 filed by Hosea Jenkins against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7516843 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Merit of Ira Deming DPM, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Merit of D-Ann Weller Ross MSN ARNP) (Mafrice, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America d/b/a The Department of Veterans Affairs d/b/a John D Dingell VA Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James K Duncan DPM
Represented By: Benjamin A. Anchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunny Sajjad DPM
Represented By: Benjamin A. Anchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toritsetse G Aniejurengho NP
Represented By: Benjamin A. Anchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Benjamin A. Anchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hosea Jenkins
Represented By: Frank Mafrice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?