Dunbar v. Spirit Airlines
Plaintiff: Mary Dunbar
Defendant: Prospect Airport Services, Inc. and Spirit Airlines
Case Number: 2:2019cv13637
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Paul D Borman
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Prospect Airport Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summers and Williams) (Danek, Brad)
January 21, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to Response re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Spirit Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3) (Shipper, Benjamin)
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Mary Dunbar. (Heilmann, Michael)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mary Dunbar. (Heilmann, Michael)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Mary Dunbar (Heilmann, Michael)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Spirit Airlines (Shipper, Benjamin)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Prospect Airport Services, Inc. (Danek, Brad)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING on #5 MOTION to Dismiss , #6 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2020 02:30 PM before District Judge Paul D. Borman (DTof)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by Spirit Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Spirit Airlines' Contract of Carriage (Updated as of October 25, 2016), #3 Exhibit 2 - Unpublished Cases) (Shipper, Benjamin)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Prospect Airport Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Contract of Carrier, #4 Exhibit C - Group of Unpublished Authority, #5 Document Continuation) (Danek, Brad)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brad A. Danek on behalf of Prospect Airport Services, Inc.. (Danek, Brad)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin I. Shipper on behalf of Spirit Airlines. (Shipper, Benjamin)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony A. Agosta on behalf of Spirit Airlines. (Agosta, Anthony)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Prospect Airport Services, Inc. from Wayne Circuit Court, case number 19-014584-NO. Receipt No: 0645-7519728 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Danek, Brad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunbar v. Spirit Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prospect Airport Services, Inc.
Represented By: Brad A. Danek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirit Airlines
Represented By: Benjamin I. Shipper
Represented By: Anthony A. Agosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Dunbar
Represented By: Michael G. Heilmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?