Richardson v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Richardson
Defendant: Select Title Company, The Michigan Group, Inc. - Livingston, Hannett, Wilson & Whitehouse, L.L.C. and Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv13643
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Denying Without Prejudice #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. See #15 ORDER re #11 MOTION to Dismiss. Entered by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
January 27, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Michael Richardson against Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Hannett, Wilson & Whitehouse, L.L.C., Select Title Company, The Michigan Group, Inc. - Livingston. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Taub, Adam)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendant Select Title Company's Responsive Pleading re #1 Complaint. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
January 17, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jennifer C. Hill appearing on behalf of Select Title Company (Hill, Jennifer)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending time for Defendant HANNETT, WILSON & WHITEHOUSE, LLC. to Respond re #1 Complaint. (Responsive Pleading due by 2/3/2020) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by The Michigan Group, Inc. - Livingston (Fleming, John)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Certificate of Service by The Michigan Group, Inc. - Livingston. (Fleming, John)
January 2, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Motion to Dismiss) (Sawyer, Ryan)
December 24, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Hannett, Wilson & Whitehouse, L.L.C. served on 12/14/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Taub, Adam)
December 24, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. The Michigan Group, Inc. - Livingston served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Taub, Adam)
December 24, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Select Title Company served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Taub, Adam)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Sawyer, Ryan)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan A. Sawyer on behalf of Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Sawyer, Ryan)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Robert Sargent on behalf of Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Sargent, Douglas)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Kinggo, III on behalf of Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Kinggo, Robert)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Taub, Adam)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Richardson against Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Hannett, Wilson & Whitehouse, L.L.C., Select Title Company, The Michigan Group, Inc. - Livingston with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7520820 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Taub, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Title Company
Represented By: Jennifer C. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Michigan Group, Inc. - Livingston
Represented By: John F. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannett, Wilson & Whitehouse, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J. Kinggo, III
Represented By: Douglas Robert Sargent
Represented By: Ryan A. Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Richardson
Represented By: Adam G. Taub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?