Reeder v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper
Plaintiff: Yasin Reeder
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper
Case Number: 2:2019cv13664
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Robert H Cleland
2 Judge: Victoria A Roberts
3 Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 3/9/2020 at 11:30 PM before District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (see image for details and dates) (LVer)
January 20, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper. (Mitchell, Matthew)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper identifying Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper. (Mitchell, Matthew)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Defendant's Time to File a First Responsive Pleading. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Robert H. Cleland and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand in Port Huron to District Judge Victoria A. Roberts and Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen in Detroit. (NAhm)
December 13, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua C. Castmore on behalf of Yasin Reeder. (Castmore, Joshua)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 19-016204-CH. Receipt No: 0645-7522906 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: U.S. District Court, Eastern District of Michigan, 14-cv-13952, Judge Victoria A. Roberts] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Mitchell, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reeder v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Matthew Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yasin Reeder
Represented By: Joshua C. Castmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?