Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Inscribed PLLC et al
Plaintiff: Esurance Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Wook Kim, Detroit Institute of Pain Musculoskeletal Medicine PLLC, Gireesh Velugubanti, M.D., Jalal Zawaideh, R.Ph., Integra Lab Management LLC, Diagnostic Solutions LLC, Integrative Neurology PLLC, Bachu Abraham, M.D., ZMC Pharmacy, L.L.C., Michigan Institute of Musculoskeletal Medicine PLLC, Arvinder Dhillon, M.D. and Inscribed PLLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv13721
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Mack, Jr on behalf of ZMC Pharmacy, L.L.C., Jalal Zawaideh, R.Ph.. (Mack, John)
February 4, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl Bressack on behalf of ZMC Pharmacy, L.L.C., Jalal Zawaideh, R.Ph.. (Bressack, Darryl)
January 24, 2020 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. ZMC Pharmacy, L.L.C. served on 1/3/2020, answer due 1/24/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
January 24, 2020 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Jalal Zawaideh, R.Ph. served on 1/3/2020, answer due 1/24/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
January 24, 2020 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Integra Lab Management LLC waiver sent on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
January 23, 2020 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Bachu Abraham, M.D. waiver sent on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
January 23, 2020 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Michigan Institute of Musculoskeletal Medicine PLLC waiver sent on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
January 23, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Detroit Institute of Pain Musculoskeletal Medicine PLLC waiver sent on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
January 6, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Gireesh Velugubanti, M.D. waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
January 6, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Diagnostic Solutions LLC waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
January 6, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Integrative Neurology PLLC waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
January 6, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Inscribed PLLC waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
January 2, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Wook Kim waiver sent on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
January 2, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Arvinder Dhillon, M.D. waiver sent on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
January 2, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily R. Warren on behalf of Arvinder Dhillon, M.D., Wook Kim. (Warren, Emily)
January 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter W. Joelson on behalf of Arvinder Dhillon, M.D., Wook Kim. (Joelson, Peter)
January 2, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gary R. Blumberg appearing on behalf of Arvinder Dhillon, M.D., Wook Kim (Blumberg, Gary)
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Esurance Insurance Company. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Insurance Company. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
December 19, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DPer)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Tertan on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Tertan, John)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Tilden on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Tilden, Nathan)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. King, Jr on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (King, Richard)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Certificate of No Liability Insurance (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Civil Cover Sheet (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company against Bachu Abraham, M.D., Detroit Institute of Pain Musculoskeletal Medicine PLLC, Arvinder Dhillon, M.D., Diagnostic Solutions LLC, Inscribed PLLC, Integra Lab Management LLC, Integrative Neurology PLLC, Michigan Institute of Musculoskeletal Medicine PLLC, Gireesh Velugubanti, M.D., Wook Kim, M.D., P.C. d/b/a Farmbrook Interventional Pain & EMG, ZMC Pharmacy, L.L.C., Jalal Zawaideh, R.Ph. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7531547 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Cook County, IL - County Where Action Arose: Macomb County - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb County, MI. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Inscribed Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #3 Exhibit 2 - Integrative Neurology Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #4 Exhibit 3 - Diagnostic Solutions Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #5 Exhibit 4 - Farmbrook Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #6 Exhibit 5 - DIPMM Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #7 Exhibit 6 - MIMM Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #8 Exhibit 7 - ZMC Pharmacy Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #9 Exhibit 8 - Integra Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #10 Exhibit 9 - Integrative Neurology Medical Record Indicating Clinical Supervisor, #11 Exhibit 10 - Integra Chart of Fraudulently Unbundled Charges of CPT Code 80369, #12 Exhibit 11 - Integra Chart of Fraudulently Unbundled Charges of CPT Code 80336, #13 Exhibit 12 - Diagnostic Solutionss Website Promoting Neurofeedback Times, #14 Exhibit 13 - Farmbrook List of DME to State of Michigan, #15 Exhibit 14 - Mail and Wire Fraud Chart, #16 Exhibit 15 - Inscribed Damages Chart, #17 Exhibit 16 - Integrative Neurology Damages Chart, #18 Exhibit 17 - Diagnostic Solutions Damages Chart, #19 Exhibit 18 - Farmbrook Damages Chart, #20 Exhibit 19 - DIPMM Damages Chart, #21 Exhibit 20 - MIMM Damages Chart, #22 Exhibit 21 - ZMC Pharmacy Damages Chart, #23 Exhibit 22 - Integra Damages Chart) (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Inscribed PLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wook Kim
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit Institute of Pain Musculoskeletal Medicine PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gireesh Velugubanti, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jalal Zawaideh, R.Ph.
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: John L. Mack, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integra Lab Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diagnostic Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrative Neurology PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bachu Abraham, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZMC Pharmacy, L.L.C.
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: John L. Mack, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Institute of Musculoskeletal Medicine PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvinder Dhillon, M.D.
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inscribed PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esurance Insurance Company
Represented By: John D. Tertan
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: John D. Tertan
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: John D. Tertan
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: John D. Tertan
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: John D. Tertan
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?