Ford Motor Co. F-150 and Ranger Truck Fuel Economy Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Matthew Smith, Ryan Combs, Al Balls, Mark Hill, Dustin Dawson, Evan Allen, Kenneth Bernard, Daniel Gardner, Michael Smith, James Williams, Brian Leja, Ryan Hubert, Rick Shurtliff, Steven Hull, David Brewer, Steve Beavers, Victor Perez, Josh Brumbaugh, William Don Cook, Dustin Walden, John Jung, John Sautter, Nicholas Leonardi, Robert Goolsby, Matthew Combs, Cody Smith, Kyle Mannion, Dean Kriner, Marshall B. Lloyd, Harold Brower, Randy Transue, Gerald O'Hara, Rick Shawley, Stephen Mattson, Kathryn Hummel, Tracey Travis, Scott Forman, Hilary Goodfriend, Dillon Drake, Keith Fencl, Benjamin Bischoff, Stephen Leszczynski, Cassandra Morrison, Matthew Brownlee, Jamar Haynes, Ramiro Antonio Sandoval Pinon, Accurate Construction Corporation, RIVERSIDE TURF FARM INC, Ronald J. Dismukes, Ahmed Abdi, Harvey Anderson, David Polley, Mark Arendt, Scott Whitehill, Jeffery Foshee, Robert Raney, Darren Honeycutt, Ramin Sartip, Mark Napier, FRANK B FLANDERS, Jeffrey Quizhpi, Jeffrey Kaloustian and Rosalynda Garza
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
In Re: Ford Motor Co. F-150 and Ranger Truck Fuel Economy Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation
Case Number: 2:2019md02901
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by James Mitchell Williams on behalf of Accurate Construction Corporation, Ronald J. Dismukes, Jeffery Foshee. (Williams, James)
February 5, 2020 Filing 65 EXHIBIT 5 and 6 re #64 Amended Complaint. [FILED IN THE TRADITIONAL MANNER] (SSch)
January 27, 2020 Filing 64 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by James Williams, Ronald J. Dismukes, Cassandra Morrison, Nicholas Leonardi, Jeffrey Quizhpi, Harold Brower, Jeffery Foshee, David Brewer, Ryan Hubert, Evan Allen, Dustin Dawson, Keith Fencl, Victor Perez, Benjamin Bischoff, Matthew Brownlee, Scott Whitehill, Matthew Smith, Rick Shurtliff, David Polley, Randy Transue, Jamar Haynes, Tracey Travis, Marshall B. Lloyd, John Jung, Steve Beavers, Robert Raney, Mark Hill, Michael Smith, Robert Goolsby, John Sautter, Dillon Drake, Josh Brumbaugh, Steven Hull, Cody Smith, Brian Leja, Rosalynda Garza, Dustin Walden, William Don Cook, Matthew Combs, Ahmed Abdi, Al Balls, Mark Arendt, Kenneth Bernard, Stephen Leszczynski, Ramiro Antonio Sandoval Pinon, Dean Kriner, Jeffrey Kaloustian, Darren Honeycutt against Ford Motor Company. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-Determination and Use of Vehicle Road-Load Force and Dynamometer Settings, #3 Exhibit 2-Ford is Investigating Emissions and Fuel Efficiency Data,, #4 Exhibit 3-2019 Ford Ranger Most Fuel-Efficient in its Class, Because Of Course It Is, #5 Exhibit 4-Adventure Further: All-New Ford Ranger Rated Most Fuel-Efficient Gas-Powered Midsize Pickup in America, #6 Exhibit 5-Real-world 2019 Ford Ranger Fuel Economy: Here Is the Unexpected Result after a 1,000 Mile Road Trip (Video) (To be filed in traditional manner), #7 Exhibit 6-Video of the testing located at https://youtu.be/W6iLtygCC7Y, (To be filed in traditional manner), #8 Exhibit 7-Data on Cars used for Testing Fuel Economy,, #9 Exhibit 8-Ford Takes Targeted Marketing Approach for Ranger Comeback, #10 Exhibit 9-The 2019 Ford Ranger Pickup Gets Slightly Better MPG Ratings Than the Honda Ridgeline, #11 Exhibit 10-Fords March 31, 2019 Quarterly Report to the SEC, #12 Exhibit 11-Ford Says Justice Dept. Has Opened Criminal Inquiry Into Emissions Issues, #13 Exhibit 12-VW Emissions Defeat Device Isnt the First, #14 Exhibit 13-2019 Ford Ranger brochure, #15 Exhibit 14-EPA Says the New Ford Ranger Gets 24 MPG on the Highway,, #16 Exhibit 15-Google and related search for F-150 fuel economy, #17 Exhibit 16-8 Best Ranked MPG Trucks of 2019, #18 Exhibit 17-Ford Surpasses 1 Million Truck Sales in 2018, #19 Exhibit 18-Monroney sticker for 2018 F-150 2.7 V6, #20 Exhibit 19-2018 Ford F-150 touts best-in-class towing, payload, fuel economy, #21 Exhibit 20-2018 Ford F-150 brochure) (Miller, E.)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING #63 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to file Exhibits in the Traditional Manner. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
January 27, 2020 Filing 63 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to file Exhibits in the Traditional Manner by All Plaintiffs. (Miller, E.)
January 17, 2020 Filing 62 STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY TANA LIN AS COUNSEL OF RECORD by Dustin Dawson, Rick Shawley (Cappio, Gretchen)
December 16, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Pitoun on behalf of Benjamin Bischoff, David Brewer, Harold Brower, Matthew Brownlee, Ryan Combs, Jamar Haynes, Dean Kriner, Nicholas Leonardi, Stephen Leszczynski, Marshall B. Lloyd, Kyle Mannion, Cassandra Morrison, Victor Perez, David Polley, Robert Raney, Tracey Travis, Scott Whitehill, James Williams. (Pitoun, Christopher)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (Consolidated Amended Master Complaint due by 1/27/2020) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
December 16, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Sean F. Cox: Status Conference held on 12/16/2019. (JMcC)
December 11, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Jong-Ju Chang on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Chang, Jong-Ju)
December 10, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison L. Carruthers on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Carruthers, Alison)
December 10, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. George on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (George, David)
November 27, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S Goldenberg on behalf of Benjamin Bischoff, David Brewer, Harold Brower, Matthew Brownlee, Ryan Combs, Jamar Haynes, Dean Kriner, Nicholas Leonardi, Stephen Leszczynski, Marshall B. Lloyd, Kyle Mannion, Cassandra Morrison, Victor Perez, David Polley, Robert Raney, Tracey Travis, Scott Whitehill, James Williams. (Goldenberg, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Appointing E. Powell Miller of the Miller Law Firm as Interim Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs re #47 MOTION to Appoint Counsel E. Powell Miller of The Miller Law Firm, P.C. as Interim Lead Counsel. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
November 21, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs' [Corrected] Motion to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) by Benjamin Bischoff, David Brewer, Harold Brower, Matthew Brownlee, Ryan Combs, Jamar Haynes, Dean Kriner, Nicholas Leonardi, Stephen Leszczynski, Marshall B. Lloyd, Kyle Mannion, Cassandra Morrison, Victor Perez, David Polley, Robert Raney, Tracey Travis, Scott Whitehill, James Williams. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A (Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP Firm Resume), #3 Exhibit B (HBSS Experienced in Complex Class Actions), #4 Exhibit C (List of Cases in ED Mich Where Steve Berman Has Leadership Role)) (Berman, Steve)
November 20, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) by Benjamin Bischoff, David Brewer, Harold Brower, Matthew Brownlee, Ryan Combs, Jamar Haynes, Dean Kriner, Nicholas Leonardi, Stephen Leszczynski, Marshall B. Lloyd, Kyle Mannion, Cassandra Morrison, Victor Perez, David Polley, Robert Raney, Tracey Travis, Scott Whitehill, James Williams. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A (Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP Firm Resume), #3 Exhibit B (HBSS Experience in Complex Class Actions), #4 Exhibit C (List of Cases in ED Mich Where Steve Berman Has Leadership Role)) (Berman, Steve)
November 20, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Ahmed Abdi, Harvey Anderson, Dustin Dawson, Darren Honeycutt, Ramin Sartip, Rick Shawley. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Young & Associates Resume, #3 Exhibit 2 - Keller Rohrback's Resume, #4 Exhibit 3 - Bleichmar Fonti & Auld's Resume, #5 Exhibit 4 - Pritzker Levine's Resume) (Young, Rodger)
November 20, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Motion for Appointment of David S. Stellings of Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP, as Interim Lead Counsel by John Sautter, Rick Shurtliff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lieff Cabraser Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - David S. Stellings Biography) (Stellings, David)
November 20, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Beasley Allen's Motion for Appointment of Interim Lead Counsel by Accurate Construction Corporation, William Don Cook, Ronald J. Dismukes, Jeffery Foshee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Beasley Allen Resume, #2 Exhibit 2-W. Daniel "Dee" Miles Resume) (Miles, W.)
November 20, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Accurate Construction Corporation, William Don Cook, Ronald J. Dismukes, Jeffery Foshee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Firm Resume) (Boggs, Jonathan)
November 20, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION to Appoint Counsel DiCello Levitt Gutzler LLC's Motion for Appointment of Interim Lead Counsel by Accurate Construction Corporation, Ronald J. Dismukes, Jeffery Foshee, Ryan Hubert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Firm Resume) (Levitt, Adam)
November 20, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION to Appoint Counsel E. Powell Miller of The Miller Law Firm, P.C. as Interim Lead Counsel by Accurate Construction Corporation, Steve Beavers, Ronald J. Dismukes, Jeffery Foshee, Ryan Hubert, Michael Smith. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - E. Powell Miller's Resume, #3 Exhibit 2 - Trial Resume, #4 Exhibit 3 - Highlights of Results Obtained in the Eastern District of Michigan, #5 Exhibit 4 - Pending Cases in the Eastern District of Michigan, #6 Exhibit 5 - Selected Resumes) (Miller, E.)
November 20, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion by Fink Bressack and Freed Kanner London & Millen for Appointment of David H. Fink and Steven A. Kanner as Interim Co-Lead Counsel by Keith Fencl, Mark Napier. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Fink Bressack Resumes, #3 Exhibit 2 - FKLM Resume, #4 Exhibit 3 - Auto Parts Transcript Aug 8, 2017, #5 Exhibit 4 - Auto Parts Transcript Oct. 3, 2019) (Fink, David)
November 20, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Interim Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class by Scott Forman, Rosalynda Garza, Hilary Goodfriend, Kathryn Hummel, Jeffrey Kaloustian, Jeffrey Quizhpi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Weitz & Luxenberg Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit B - Biography of Paul F. Novak, #3 Exhibit C - Stull, Stull & Brody Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit D - Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman Firm Bio) (Novak, Paul)
November 20, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Benjamin Bischoff, David Brewer, Harold Brower, Matthew Brownlee, Ryan Combs, Jamar Haynes, Dean Kriner, Nicholas Leonardi, Stephen Leszczynski, Marshall B. Lloyd, Kyle Mannion, Cassandra Morrison, Gerald O'Hara, Victor Perez, David Polley, Robert Raney, Tracey Travis, Scott Whitehill, James Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Firm Bio, #2 Exhibit B - Jason J. Thompson Bio, #3 Exhibit C - Attorney Bios) (Thompson, Jason)
November 20, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary S. Graifman on behalf of Rosalynda Garza, Jeffrey Kaloustian, Jeffrey Quizhpi. (Graifman, Gary)
November 19, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany R. Ellis on behalf of Scott Forman, Hilary Goodfriend, Kathryn Hummel. (Ellis, Tiffany)
November 19, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Stamatopoulos on behalf of Scott Forman, Hilary Goodfriend, Kathryn Hummel. (Stamatopoulos, Gregory)
November 19, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Gjonaj on behalf of Scott Forman, Hilary Goodfriend, Kathryn Hummel. (Gjonaj, Diana)
November 19, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul F. Novak on behalf of Scott Forman, Hilary Goodfriend, Kathryn Hummel. (Novak, Paul)
November 19, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by William Kalas on behalf of Steve Beavers, Ronald J. Dismukes, Ryan Hubert, Michael Smith. (Kalas, William)
November 19, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily E. Hughes on behalf of Steve Beavers, Ronald J. Dismukes, Ryan Hubert, Michael Smith. (Hughes, Emily)
November 19, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon S. Almonrode on behalf of Steve Beavers, Ronald J. Dismukes, Ryan Hubert, Michael Smith. (Almonrode, Sharon)
November 19, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Powell Miller on behalf of Steve Beavers, Ronald J. Dismukes, Ryan Hubert, Michael Smith. (Miller, E.)
November 15, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany R. Ellis on behalf of Rosalynda Garza, Jeffrey Kaloustian, Jeffrey Quizhpi. (Ellis, Tiffany)
November 15, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Stamatopoulos on behalf of Rosalynda Garza, Jeffrey Kaloustian, Jeffrey Quizhpi. (Stamatopoulos, Gregory)
November 15, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan David Boggs on behalf of Accurate Construction Corporation, Ronald J. Dismukes, Jeffery Foshee. (Boggs, Jonathan)
November 15, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Gjonaj on behalf of Rosalynda Garza, Jeffrey Kaloustian, Jeffrey Quizhpi. (Gjonaj, Diana)
November 15, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul F. Novak on behalf of Jeffrey Kaloustian. (Novak, Paul)
November 13, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Steve W. Berman on behalf of Benjamin Bischoff, David Brewer, Harold Brower, Matthew Brownlee, Ryan Combs, Jamar Haynes, Dean Kriner, Nicholas Leonardi, Stephen Leszczynski, Marshall B. Lloyd, Kyle Mannion, Cassandra Morrison, Victor Perez, David Polley, Robert Raney, Tracey Travis, Scott Whitehill, James Williams. (Berman, Steve)
November 13, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Irene McBride on behalf of Evan Allen, Al Balls, Brian Leja, Stephen Mattson, John Sautter, Rick Shurtliff, Randy Transue. (McBride, Katherine)
November 13, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Wilson McClelland Dunlavey on behalf of Evan Allen, Al Balls, Brian Leja, Stephen Mattson, John Sautter, Rick Shurtliff, Randy Transue. (Dunlavey, Wilson)
November 13, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Budner on behalf of Evan Allen, Al Balls, Brian Leja, Stephen Mattson, John Sautter, Rick Shurtliff, Randy Transue. (Budner, Kevin)
November 13, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Phong-Chau Nguyen on behalf of Evan Allen, Al Balls, Brian Leja, Stephen Mattson, John Sautter, Rick Shurtliff, Randy Transue. (Nguyen, Phong-Chau)
November 13, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by David Stellings on behalf of Evan Allen, Al Balls, Brian Leja, Stephen Mattson, John Sautter, Rick Shurtliff, Randy Transue. (Stellings, David)
November 12, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa R. Emert on behalf of Scott Forman, Rosalynda Garza, Hilary Goodfriend, Kathryn Hummel, Jeffrey Quizhpi. (Emert, Melissa)
November 11, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Tangren on behalf of Ryan Hubert. (Tangren, John)
November 11, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #20 Notice of Appearance by Ryan Hubert (Levitt, Adam)
November 11, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Levitt on behalf of Ryan Hubert. (Levitt, Adam)
November 8, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul F. Novak on behalf of Rosalynda Garza, Jeffrey Quizhpi. (Novak, Paul)
November 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by H. Clay Barnett, III on behalf of Accurate Construction Corporation, Ronald J. Dismukes, Jeffery Foshee. (Barnett, H.)
November 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Daniel Miles, III on behalf of Accurate Construction Corporation, Ronald J. Dismukes, Jeffery Foshee. (Miles, W.)
November 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodger D. Young on behalf of Ahmed Abdi, Darren Honeycutt, Ramin Sartip. (Young, Rodger)
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David Fernandes on behalf of Evan Allen, Al Balls, Brian Leja, Stephen Mattson, John Sautter, Rick Shurtliff, Randy Transue. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Fernandes, David)
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Roland Tellis on behalf of Evan Allen, Al Balls, Brian Leja, Stephen Mattson, John Sautter, Rick Shurtliff, Randy Transue. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Tellis, Roland)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Regarding Initial Status Conference and Motions for Interim Lead Counsel. (Motions re Interim Lead Counsel due by 11/20/2019, Status Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Sean F. Cox) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A. Lienhardt on behalf of Steve Beavers, Ryan Hubert, Michael Smith. (Lienhardt, Dennis)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Michael Hogan on behalf of Keith Fencl, Mark Napier. (Hogan, Brian)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Ann Justice on behalf of Keith Fencl, Mark Napier. (Justice, Kimberly)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jonathan M Jagher appearing on behalf of Keith Fencl, Mark Napier (Jagher, Jonathan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael E. Moskovitz appearing on behalf of Keith Fencl, Mark Napier (Moskovitz, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Douglas A Millen appearing on behalf of Keith Fencl, Mark Napier (Millen, Douglas)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Steven A. Kanner appearing on behalf of Keith Fencl, Mark Napier (Kanner, Steven)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl Bressack on behalf of Keith Fencl, Mark Napier. (Bressack, Darryl)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan J. Fink on behalf of Keith Fencl, Mark Napier. (Fink, Nathan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Fink on behalf of Keith Fencl, Mark Napier. (Fink, David)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-2) (SSch)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 Transfer Order from the Judicial Panel on Multidistict Litigation, pursuant to 28 USC 1407, that the actions listed pending outside the Eastern District of Michigan are transferred to Eastern District of Michigan, creating MDL 2901. (SSch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford Motor Co. F-150 and Ranger Truck Fuel Economy Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Stephanie A. Douglas
Represented By: Mark Boyle
Represented By: Susan M. McKeever
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Yeatman
Represented By: Joel A. Dewey
Represented By: Alison L. Carruthers
Represented By: Jong-Ju Chang
Represented By: David M. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Smith
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Combs
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Christopher R. Pitoun
Represented By: Jeffrey S Goldenberg
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Balls
Represented By: Wilson McClelland Dunlavey
Represented By: Katherine Irene McBride
Represented By: Caroline F. Bartlett
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: Mark C. Rossman
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Brian M. Saxe
Represented By: David Stellings
Represented By: Kevin Budner
Represented By: Phong-Chau Nguyen
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hill
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Dawson
Represented By: Ryan Patrick McDevitt
Represented By: Jonathan K. Levine
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Lesley E. Weaver
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Jaye Quadrozzi
Represented By: Rodger D. Young
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Allen
Represented By: Wilson McClelland Dunlavey
Represented By: Katherine Irene McBride
Represented By: Caroline F. Bartlett
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: Mark C. Rossman
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Brian M. Saxe
Represented By: David Stellings
Represented By: Kevin Budner
Represented By: Phong-Chau Nguyen
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Bernard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Gardner
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Smith
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Joseph C. Hashmall
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Williams
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Christopher R. Pitoun
Represented By: Jeffrey S Goldenberg
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Leja
Represented By: Wilson McClelland Dunlavey
Represented By: Katherine Irene McBride
Represented By: Caroline F. Bartlett
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: Mark C. Rossman
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Brian M. Saxe
Represented By: David Stellings
Represented By: Kevin Budner
Represented By: Phong-Chau Nguyen
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Hubert
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Matthew D. Schelkopf
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: John E. Tangren
Represented By: Joseph G. Sauder
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Adam M. Prom
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Shurtliff
Represented By: Mark C. Rossman
Represented By: Brian M. Saxe
Represented By: David Stellings
Represented By: Wilson McClelland Dunlavey
Represented By: Kevin Budner
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Katherine Irene McBride
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: Phong-Chau Nguyen
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Hull
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Brewer
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Christopher R. Pitoun
Represented By: Jeffrey S Goldenberg
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Beavers
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Perez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Christopher R. Pitoun
Represented By: Jeffrey S Goldenberg
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Brumbaugh
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Don Cook
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Jonathan David Boggs
Represented By: Benjamin Lee Bailey
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Walden
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Jung
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sautter
Represented By: Wilson McClelland Dunlavey
Represented By: Katherine Irene McBride
Represented By: Caroline F. Bartlett
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: Mark C. Rossman
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Brian M. Saxe
Represented By: David Stellings
Represented By: Kevin Budner
Represented By: Phong-Chau Nguyen
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Leonardi
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Christopher R. Pitoun
Represented By: Jeffrey S Goldenberg
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Goolsby
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Combs
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Smith
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Mannion
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Christopher R. Pitoun
Represented By: Jeffrey S Goldenberg
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Kriner
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Christopher R. Pitoun
Represented By: Jeffrey S Goldenberg
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall B. Lloyd
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Christopher R. Pitoun
Represented By: Jeffrey S Goldenberg
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Brower
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Christopher R. Pitoun
Represented By: Jeffrey S Goldenberg
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Transue
Represented By: Wilson McClelland Dunlavey
Represented By: Katherine Irene McBride
Represented By: Caroline F. Bartlett
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: Mark C. Rossman
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Brian M. Saxe
Represented By: David Stellings
Represented By: Kevin Budner
Represented By: Phong-Chau Nguyen
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald O'Hara
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Shawley
Represented By: Ryan Patrick McDevitt
Represented By: Jonathan K. Levine
Represented By: Tana Lin
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Lesley E. Weaver
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Rodger D. Young
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Mattson
Represented By: Wilson McClelland Dunlavey
Represented By: Katherine Irene McBride
Represented By: Caroline F. Bartlett
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: Mark C. Rossman
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Brian M. Saxe
Represented By: David Stellings
Represented By: Kevin Budner
Represented By: Phong-Chau Nguyen
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Hummel
Represented By: Gary S. Graifman
Represented By: Howard T. Longman
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Tiffany R. Ellis
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Gregory Stamatopoulos
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Travis
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Christopher R. Pitoun
Represented By: Jeffrey S Goldenberg
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Forman
Represented By: Gary S. Graifman
Represented By: Howard T. Longman
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Tiffany R. Ellis
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Gregory Stamatopoulos
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilary Goodfriend
Represented By: Gary S. Graifman
Represented By: Howard T. Longman
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Tiffany R. Ellis
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Gregory Stamatopoulos
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dillon Drake
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Fencl
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Justice
Represented By: Steven A. Kanner
Represented By: Michael E. Moskovitz
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Joseph J. DePalma
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Douglas A Millen
Represented By: Jonathan M Jagher
Represented By: Brian Michael Hogan
Represented By: Nathan J. Fink
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Bischoff
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Christopher R. Pitoun
Represented By: Jeffrey S Goldenberg
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Leszczynski
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Christopher R. Pitoun
Represented By: Jeffrey S Goldenberg
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Morrison
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Christopher R. Pitoun
Represented By: Jeffrey S Goldenberg
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Brownlee
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Christopher R. Pitoun
Represented By: Jeffrey S Goldenberg
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamar Haynes
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Christopher R. Pitoun
Represented By: Jeffrey S Goldenberg
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramiro Antonio Sandoval Pinon
Represented By: Ivy T. Ngo
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Accurate Construction Corporation
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Jonathan David Boggs
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: James Mitchell Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RIVERSIDE TURF FARM INC
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Dismukes
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Emily E. Hughes
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Jonathan David Boggs
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: James Mitchell Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Abdi
Represented By: Ryan Patrick McDevitt
Represented By: Jonathan K. Levine
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Lesley E. Weaver
Represented By: Anne Kathleen Davis
Represented By: Jaye Quadrozzi
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Joshua David Samra
Represented By: Rodger D. Young
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Anderson
Represented By: Ryan Patrick McDevitt
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Lesley E. Weaver
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Anne Kathleen Davis
Represented By: Jaye Quadrozzi
Represented By: Joshua David Samra
Represented By: Rodger D. Young
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Polley
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Christopher R. Pitoun
Represented By: Jeffrey S Goldenberg
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Arendt
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Raina C. Borrelli
Represented By: David A. Goodwin
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Whitehill
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Christopher R. Pitoun
Represented By: Jeffrey S Goldenberg
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Foshee
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Jonathan David Boggs
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: James Mitchell Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Raney
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Christopher R. Pitoun
Represented By: Jeffrey S Goldenberg
Represented By: Jason J. Thompson
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Honeycutt
Represented By: Ryan Patrick McDevitt
Represented By: Jonathan K. Levine
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Lesley E. Weaver
Represented By: Anne Kathleen Davis
Represented By: Jaye Quadrozzi
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Joshua David Samra
Represented By: Rodger D. Young
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramin Sartip
Represented By: Ryan Patrick McDevitt
Represented By: Jonathan K. Levine
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Lesley E. Weaver
Represented By: Anne Kathleen Davis
Represented By: Jaye Quadrozzi
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Joshua David Samra
Represented By: Rodger D. Young
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Napier
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Justice
Represented By: Steven A. Kanner
Represented By: Michael E. Moskovitz
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Joseph J. DePalma
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Douglas A Millen
Represented By: Jonathan M Jagher
Represented By: Brian Michael Hogan
Represented By: Nathan J. Fink
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK B FLANDERS
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Quizhpi
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Tiffany R. Ellis
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Gary S. Graifman
Represented By: Gregory Stamatopoulos
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Kaloustian
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Tiffany R. Ellis
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Represented By: Gary S. Graifman
Represented By: Gregory Stamatopoulos
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalynda Garza
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Tiffany R. Ellis
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Gary S. Graifman
Represented By: Gregory Stamatopoulos
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Ford Motor Co. F-150 and Ranger Truck Fuel Economy Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?