Aulcoarah Private Society et al v. Wayne County Probate Court et al
Plaintiff: Aulcoarah Private Society, Keshawn Westberry and Tracy Moten
Defendant: Wayne County Probate Court, Wayne County Treasurer, Wayne County Tax Assessor Office and Bernard J. Youngblood
Case Number: 2:2020cv10131
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Michael J Hluchaniuk
Referring Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #7 Order to Show Cause on All Plaintiffs mailed to Aulcoarah Private Society, 16 N. Alabama Rd, Private Unit PO Box 248, Monroeville, AL 36460. (EKar)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 3/13/2020 Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
January 31, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Directing Service by the US Marshal, #5 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on Aulcoarah Private Society at 16 N Alabama Rd, Private Unit PO Box 248, Monroeville, AL 36460. (EKar)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar)
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Aulcoarah Private Society. (SSch)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Tracy Moten, Aulcoarah Private Society, Keshawn Westberry against Wayne County Probate Court, Wayne County Tax Assessor Office, Wayne County Treasurer, Bernard J. Youngblood (SSch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aulcoarah Private Society et al v. Wayne County Probate Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne County Probate Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne County Treasurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne County Tax Assessor Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard J. Youngblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aulcoarah Private Society
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keshawn Westberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Moten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?