Johnson v. Washington et al
Plaintiff: Ronald C. Johnson
Defendant: Patricia Schmidt, Willis Chapman, Pain Management Commitee, Jeffrey Blessman, Lia Gulick, Keith Pappendick, Carmen McIntyre, Julianne Martino, Stacy Sylvie, Mari Kay Sherry, Heidi Washington and Ricky Coleman
Case Number: 2:2020cv10147
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to amend #1 Complaint by Ronald C. Johnson. (DPer)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Partial Dismissal re #1 Complaint, filed by Ronald C. Johnson., Keith Pappendick, Heidi Washington, Willis Chapman, Corizon Health Services, Inc., and Carmen McIntyre terminated. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg) Modified on 2/3/2020 (TMcg).
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by Ronald C. Johnson. (DAll)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Ronald C. Johnson. (DAll)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Ronald C. Johnson. (DAll)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ronald C. Johnson against Jeffrey Blessman, Willis Chapman, Ricky Coleman, Lia Gulick, Julianne Martino, Carmen McIntyre, Pain Management Commitee, Keith Pappendick, Patricia Schmidt, Mari Kay Sherry, Stacy Sylvie, Heidi Washington (DAll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willis Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pain Management Commitee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Blessman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lia Gulick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Pappendick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julianne Martino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Sylvie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mari Kay Sherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?