Mr. Vapor Wholesale, LLC v. Zee Star, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mr. Vapor Wholesale, LLC
Defendant: Zee Star, Inc. and Zee Wholesale
Case Number: 2:2020cv10197
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Referring Judge: Michael J Hluchaniuk
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Zee Star, Inc. of withdrawal of #7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, . (Murphy, Kristin)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint: (Response due by 4/8/2020) Entered by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
March 9, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, (and Proposed Order) by Zee Star, Inc.. (Murphy, Kristin)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 [WITHDRAWN] Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Zee Star, Inc.. (Murphy, Kristin) Modified on 3/10/2020 (JCur).
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ka'Nea Kenyetta Brooks on behalf of Zee Star, Inc.. (Brooks, Ka'Nea)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin L. Murphy on behalf of Zee Star, Inc.. (Murphy, Kristin)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 Trademark Report Sent To Washington (SSch)
February 17, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Zee Star, Inc. served on 2/16/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (VanOphem, John)
February 6, 2020 NOTICE of Error directed to: John A. VanOphem. Form AO 120 is missing. The filing attorney must file the form found on www.uscourts.gov with the Court to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SSch)
January 28, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Zee Star, Inc.* (LGra)
January 28, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mr. Vapor Wholesale, LLC against Zee Star, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7574693 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (VanOphem, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mr. Vapor Wholesale, LLC v. Zee Star, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zee Star, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zee Wholesale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Vapor Wholesale, LLC
Represented By: John A. VanOphem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?