Shafiq v. Department of Justice
Plaintiff: Hatim Shafiq
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Case Number: 2:2020cv10213
Filed: January 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Denise Page Hood
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 4/13/2020 10:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
February 28, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by U.S. Department of Justice. (Darling, Bradley)
February 28, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Bradley Darling appearing on behalf of U.S. Department of Justice (Darling, Bradley)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Record) (Legghio, Brian)
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Record) (Legghio, Brian)
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Department of Justice served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Record) (Legghio, Brian)
January 28, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (LHos)
January 28, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *U.S. Department of Justice * (LHos)
January 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Hatim Shafiq against U.S. Department of Justice. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7577244 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Legghio, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shafiq v. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hatim Shafiq
Represented By: Brian M Legghio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Bradley Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?