Rush v. Ellis
Plaintiff: Laverne Rush
Defendant: David Russell Ellis
Case Number: 2:2020cv10320
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument on Laverne Rush at 6501 E 11 Mile Road Bldg. 270, Warren, MI 48397. (AChu)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #3 MOTION to Dismiss (AChu)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by David Russell Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1. EEO Report of Investigation, #3 Exhibit 2. EEO Administrative Law Judge Request Confirmation, #4 Exhibit 3. Emails Attached to Plaintiffs State-Court Petition) (Toomey, Zak)
February 11, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Text-Only Order on Laverne Rush at 6501 E 11 Mile Rd Bldg 270, Warren, MI 48397. (AChu)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER GARNTING #2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) filed by David Russell Ellis. (Response due by 3/6/2020) Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by David Russell Ellis. (Toomey, Zak)
February 7, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LHos)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by David Russell Ellis from 16th Judical Circuit (Macomb County), case number 2020-000169-PH. No Fee Required - US Government. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Toomey, Zak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rush v. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laverne Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Russell Ellis
Represented By: Zak Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?