Trudell et al v. Hair et al
Plaintiff: Trudell and Associates LLC, Steven Trudell Entertainment, LLC, Your Generation In Concert, LLC and Steven Trudell
Defendant: Jr. George Troia, Joseph R. Boettger, Raymond Marshall Hair, Jr., Detroit Federation of Musicians, Local No. 5, A.F. of M., Fint Federation of Musicians, Local No. 542 A.F. of M., American Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada and Flint Federation of Musicians, Local No. 542 A.F. of M.
Case Number: 2:2020cv10446
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Referring Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
2 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cronin, Sabrina)
April 17, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cronin, Sabrina)
April 13, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response re #15 MOTION to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cronin, Sabrina)
March 30, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Remand filed by All Defendants. (Garner, Jennifer)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Respond to Defendants' Motions #11 , #13 . Response due by 4/17/2020. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
March 24, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11, #11 MOTION to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Cronin, Sabrina)
March 20, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #15 MOTION to Remand (Cronin, Sabrina)
March 20, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Cronin, Sabrina)
March 20, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Sabrina Shaheen Cronin on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Cronin, Sabrina)
March 16, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 by All Defendants. (Garner, Jennifer)
March 4, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST for Judicial Notice Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 201 by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - NLRB Region 7 Decision to Partially Dismiss, #2 Exhibit B - NLRB Region 7 Decision to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit C - NLRB Region 7 Decision to Partially Dismiss, #4 Exhibit D - NLRB General Counsel Denial of Appeal, #5 Exhibit E - NLRB General Counsel Denial of Appeal, #6 Exhibit F - NLRB General Counsel Denial of Appeal, #7 Exhibit G - NLRB Region 7 Decision to Approve Agreement, #8 Exhibit H - NLRB General Counsel Denial of Appeal, #9 Exhibit I - NLRB Region 7 Decision to Dismiss) (Garner, Jennifer)
March 4, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Garner, Jennifer)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith to District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (NAhm)
February 21, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Fint Federation of Musicians, Local No. 542 A.F. of M. (Garner, Jennifer)
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Detroit Federation of Musicians, Local No. 5, A.F. of M. (Garner, Jennifer)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by American Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada (Garner, Jennifer)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jennifer Patrice Garner appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Garner, Jennifer)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig E. Zucker on behalf of All Defendants. (Zucker, Craig)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle C. Harrell on behalf of All Defendants. (Harrell, Michelle)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by All Defendants Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J) (Harrell, Michelle)
February 21, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBIT B - State Court Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, by All Defendants (Harrell, Michelle)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 20-179332-CZ. Receipt No: 0645-7610105 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court, Eastern District, 19-10249, Judge Bernard Friedman] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint) (Harrell, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trudell et al v. Hair et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jr. George Troia
Represented By: Michelle C. Harrell
Represented By: Craig E. Zucker
Represented By: Jennifer Patrice Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Boettger
Represented By: Michelle C. Harrell
Represented By: Craig E. Zucker
Represented By: Jennifer Patrice Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Marshall Hair, Jr.
Represented By: Michelle C. Harrell
Represented By: Craig E. Zucker
Represented By: Jennifer Patrice Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit Federation of Musicians, Local No. 5, A.F. of M.
Represented By: Michelle C. Harrell
Represented By: Craig E. Zucker
Represented By: Jennifer Patrice Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fint Federation of Musicians, Local No. 542 A.F. of M.
Represented By: Michelle C. Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada
Represented By: Michelle C. Harrell
Represented By: Craig E. Zucker
Represented By: Jennifer Patrice Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flint Federation of Musicians, Local No. 542 A.F. of M.
Represented By: Michelle C. Harrell
Represented By: Craig E. Zucker
Represented By: Jennifer Patrice Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trudell and Associates LLC
Represented By: Sabrina Shaheen Cronin
Represented By: Bryan Cermak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Trudell Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: Sabrina Shaheen Cronin
Represented By: Bryan Cermak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Your Generation In Concert, LLC
Represented By: Sabrina Shaheen Cronin
Represented By: Bryan Cermak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Trudell
Represented By: Sabrina Shaheen Cronin
Represented By: Bryan Cermak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?