Almlhany v. American Steamship Company
Plaintiff: Zakarya Almlhany
Defendant: American Steamship Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv10448
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Michael J Hluchaniuk
Referring Judge: David M Lawson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Interim Status Conference set for 8/3/2020 at 9:00 AM; Discovery due by 9/8/2020; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 9/30/2020; Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/12/2021 at 3:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 5/25/2021 at 8:30 AM before District Judge David M. Lawson. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (Refer to image for additional dates) (MacKay, K)
April 8, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge David M. Lawson: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 4/8/2020. (SPin)
April 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul D. Galea on behalf of American Steamship Company. (Galea, Paul)
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean J. O'Bryan on behalf of Zakarya Almlhany. (O'Bryan, Sean)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Apelis, Markus)
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by American Steamship Company identifying Corporate Parent Gatx Corporation for American Steamship Company. (Apelis, Markus)
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 3:00 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. See image for document deadline. (SPin)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by American Steamship Company. (Apelis, Markus)
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *American Steamship Company* (DAll)
February 24, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Zakarya Almlhany against American Steamship Company with Jury Demand. Fee waiver included in accordance with 28 USC 1916. Plaintiff requests summons issued. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Pre-Payment of Fees and Costs) (O'Bryan, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almlhany v. American Steamship Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Steamship Company
Represented By: Paul D. Galea
Represented By: Markus Edgars Apelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zakarya Almlhany
Represented By: Dennis M. O'Bryan
Represented By: Sean J. O'Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?