Horne et al v. Inkster
Plaintiff: James Horne, Thomas Diaz, Kenneth Brown, Henry L. Crump, Jr. and John Knight Jr
Defendant: City Of Inkster
Case Number: 2:2020cv10454
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Michael J Hluchaniuk
Referring Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE remanding case to WAYNE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT. (DPer)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED ORDER REMANDING CASE to Wayne County Circuit Court. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPer)
March 25, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference and Telephonic Scheduling Conference Call on 4/1/2020 is Cancelled re #6 Order. (DPar)
March 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of withdrawal of #9 MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 MOTION to Remand . (Dennings, Teri)
March 20, 2020 Filing 10 Amended MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Dennings, Teri)
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Dennings, Teri)
March 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Dennings, Teri)
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Dennings, Teri)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, (Scheduling Conference set for 4/1/2020 10:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by City Of Inkster. (Rudy, Charles)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Charles S. Rudy appearing on behalf of City Of Inkster (Rudy, Charles)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John M. Nader appearing on behalf of City Of Inkster (Nader, John)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David W. Jones appearing on behalf of City Of Inkster (Jones, David)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City Of Inkster from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 19-017312-CK. Receipt No: 0645-7611083 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Nader, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horne et al v. Inkster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Horne
Represented By: Teri L. Dennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Diaz
Represented By: Teri L. Dennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Brown
Represented By: Teri L. Dennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry L. Crump, Jr.
Represented By: Teri L. Dennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Knight Jr
Represented By: Teri L. Dennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Inkster
Represented By: John M. Nader
Represented By: Charles S. Rudy
Represented By: David W. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?