Mart v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Jerry Mart
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv10473
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: David M Lawson
2 Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING CASE: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 7/15/2020 04:00 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Tracey L. Porter appearing on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Porter, Tracey)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Ford Motor Company waiver sent on 3/6/2020, answer due 5/5/2020. (Lemberg, Sergei)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL AND REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge David M. Lawson to District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (NAhm)
February 25, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
February 25, 2020 NOTICE of Error directed to: Sergei Lemberg re #1 Complaint,,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SKra)
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBIT by Jerry Mart (Lemberg, Sergei)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jerry Mart against Ford Motor Company with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7625522 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lemberg, Sergei)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mart v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Tracey L. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Mart
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?