Cana Distributors, LLC v. Portovino, LLC
Plaintiff: Cana Distributors, LLC
Defendant: Portovino, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv10659
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Denise Page Hood
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 REPLY to Response re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Portovino, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Unpublished Cases Bookmarked) (Infante, Joseph)
April 3, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE to #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (Bachand, Donald)
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF HEARING on #2 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2020 02:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by Portovino, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Motion, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A - 5.14.15 Email, #4 Exhibit B - 5.27.15 Email, #5 Exhibit C - 12.14.15 Email, #6 Exhibit D - 7.27.16 Email, #7 Exhibit E - 6.6.17 Email, #8 Exhibit F - 9.12.17 Email, #9 Exhibit G - 11.6.17 Email, #10 Exhibit H - 1.29.19 Email, #11 Exhibit I - 5.1.19 Email, #12 Exhibit J - Ltr to Cana 10.28.19, #13 Exhibit K - Ltr from OPC 11.11.19, #14 Exhibit L - Ltr to OPC 11.21.19, #15 Exhibit M - Ltr from OPC 11.26.19, #16 Exhibit N - Ltr to OPC 11.26.19, #17 Exhibit O - MLCC Wholesaler FAQ, #18 Exhibit P - Complaint, #19 Exhibit Q - Unpublished Cases) (Infante, Joseph)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Portovino, LLC from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2020-179114-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7673112 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - NYS Corporate Record, #2 Exhibit B - MI Corporate Record) (Infante, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cana Distributors, LLC v. Portovino, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portovino, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Infante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cana Distributors, LLC
Represented By: Donald R. Bachand, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?