Sykes v. Donnellon et al
Plaintiff: Dorian Trevor Sykes
Defendant: Tim Donnellon, Tracy Decaussin, A. Miller and Corizon Health Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv10689
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Terrence G Berg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to establish plaintiff's diagnosis by Dorian Trevor Sykes. (DPer)
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for appointment of counsel by Dorian Trevor Sykes. (DPer)
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Dorian Trevor Sykes. (DPer)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Correct Deficiency for failure to submit 4 additional copies. Correction due by 4/17/2020 Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (LGra)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $0 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (LGra)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Dorian Trevor Sykes. (DAll)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dorian Trevor Sykes against Corizon Health Corporation, Tracy Decaussin, Tim Donnellon, A. Miller (DAll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sykes v. Donnellon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Donnellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Decaussin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorian Trevor Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?