Alharq v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Saleh Alharq
Defendant: American Express Bank FSB, Trans Union, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv11010
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Anthony P Patti
Referring Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 20 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by American Express Bank FSB identifying Other Affiliate American Express Company for American Express Bank FSB. (Best, Stuart)
June 11, 2020 Filing 19 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Transunion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Policchio, James)
June 11, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Policchio on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Policchio, James)
June 11, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra Davis Jansen on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra)
June 11, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Nettleingham on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Nettleingham, Brian)
June 8, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Fraser, Tamara)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings as to Defendant American Express. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER STRIKING #12 Stipulation filed by American Express Bank FSB. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
May 19, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, to file Responsive Pleadings by American Express Bank FSB (Best, Stuart)
May 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart A. Best on behalf of American Express Bank FSB. (Best, Stuart)
May 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time For Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to File Responsive Pleading. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sidney L. Frank on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Frank, Sidney)
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Fraser, Tamara)
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tamara E. Fraser on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Fraser, Tamara)
April 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick G. Gagniuk on behalf of Saleh Alharq. (Gagniuk, Patrick)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Trans Union, LLC* (LGra)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Experian Information Solutions, Inc.* (LGra)
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *American Express Bank FSB* (LGra)
April 24, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry P. Smith on behalf of Saleh Alharq. (Smith, Larry)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Saleh Alharq against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7759011 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Marco, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alharq v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Bank FSB
Represented By: Stuart A. Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Sandra Davis Jansen
Represented By: James L. Policchio
Represented By: Brian A. Nettleingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Sidney L. Frank
Represented By: Tamara E. Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saleh Alharq
Represented By: Larry P. Smith
Represented By: David M. Marco
Represented By: Patrick G. Gagniuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?