Cincinnati Insurance Company v. First Watch Restaurants, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Defendant: First Watch Restaurants, Inc. and Kalamata IP, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv11148
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Michael J Hluchaniuk
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER to be Bound by Judicial Determination. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. First Watch Restaurants, Inc. waiver sent on 5/26/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Crandell, Patrick)
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Kalamata IP, LLC waiver sent on 5/13/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Crandell, Patrick)
May 6, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Kalamata IP, LLC* (DAll)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *First Watch Restaurants, Inc.* (DAll)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Cincinnati Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Cincinnati Financial Corporation for Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Crandell, Patrick)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7785671 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): USDC for the Eastern District of Michigan, 2:19-cv-13534-SJM-MJH, Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3) (Crandell, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cincinnati Insurance Company v. First Watch Restaurants, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick D. Crandell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Watch Restaurants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalamata IP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?