Gaines v. Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jordan Gaines
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv11178
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Michael J Hluchaniuk
Referring Judge: Linda V Parker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/30/2020 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker (RLou)
June 30, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Brooke H. Knight, Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company (Brown, Stephen)
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and/or Avoidance Defenses by Brooke H. Knight, Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - H3V24341797370- Comp Cert Pol, #2 Exhibit B - Application) (Brown, Stephen)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Further Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Responsive Pleading due by 6/30/2020). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Responsive Pleading due by 6/22/2020). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen P. Brown on behalf of Brooke H. Knight, Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company. (Brown, Stephen)
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason J. Liss on behalf of Jordan Gaines. (Liss, Jason)
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Brooke H. Knight* (DAll)
May 12, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendant Brooke H. Knight. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #1 Complaint,, Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Kutinsky, Adam)
May 12, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
May 12, 2020 NOTICE of Error directed to: Adam B. Kutinsky re #1 Complaint,,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DAll)
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company* (DAll)
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jordan Gaines against Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7796133 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb, Michigan - County Where Action Arose: Macomb, Michigan - County of 1st Defendant: Boston, Massachusetts. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Kutinsky, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaines v. Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Gaines
Represented By: Adam B. Kutinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?