Gardner v. Brock et al
Plaintiff: Eric Gardner
Defendant: R. Brock and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2020cv11244
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 JUDGMENT in favor of defendant against plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
June 15, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #7 Opinion and Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, on Eric Gardner Pris. No., Carson City (MSP, )10274 Boyer Rd., Carson City, MI 48811-9746 (JCur)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION AND ORDER denying plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; ORDER requiring plaintiff to pay the filing fee within thirty days and vacating #6 order waiving prepayment of filing fee. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 [VACATED 6/15/2020] ORDER granting and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $0 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (NAhm) Modified on 6/15/2020 (JCur).
May 20, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Western District of Michigan. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 Docket Sheet from Michigan Western; Case Number 1:20-cv-00381.
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Eastern District of Michigan; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal) [Transferred from miwd on 5/20/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by plaintiff Eric Andrew Gardner #287557 (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (ems) [Transferred from miwd on 5/20/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT re #1 by plaintiff Eric Andrew Gardner #287557 (ems) [Transferred from miwd on 5/20/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDCOMPLAINT with magistrate referral and jury demand against R. Brock, Unknown Party #1 filed by Eric Andrew Gardner #287557 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10) (ems) [Transferred from Michigan Western; Case Number 1:20-cv-00381.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. Brock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?