Weikert v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jo D. Weikert
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv11277
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Sean F Cox
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 8/11/2020 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (Zaidel, B)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Sue Stempky-Kime on behalf of Jo D. Weikert. (Stempky-Kime, Sarah)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 REPLY to Defendant's Affirmative Defenses by Jo D. Weikert. (Christensen, David)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Christensen on behalf of Jo D. Weikert. (Christensen, David)
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Torpey, Scott)
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Torpey, Scott)
May 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy James O'Connell on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (O'Connell, Timothy)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Delta Air Lines, Inc. from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 20-005205-NO. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7817793 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint) (Torpey, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weikert v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo D. Weikert
Represented By: David E. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Scott R. Torpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?