ALKATHI, INC v. PrimeOne Insurance Company
Plaintiff: ALKATHI, INC
Defendant: PrimeOne Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv11452
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED #1 Complaint,, by ALKATHI, INC (pursuant to FRCP 15(a)(1)(B)) (McCray, Douglas)
July 6, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by PrimeOne Insurance Company (Berkal, David)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by PrimeOne Insurance Company. (Berkal, David)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David J. Berkal appearing on behalf of PrimeOne Insurance Company (Berkal, David)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by ALKATHI, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 (PrimeOne web-site), #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 (Summary of On-Line Changes), #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 (DIFS profile), #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 (Utah Ins. Dept. profile), #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 (Cert. of Existence), #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 (Utah Ins. 2016 Ann. Report), #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 (DIFS 2016 Ann. Report))) (McCray, Douglas)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David J. Berkal appearing on behalf of PrimeOne Insurance Company (Berkal, David)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Douglas G. McCray for on behalf of ALKATHI, INC to Show Cause why this should not be dismissed for lack of Diversity Jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 6/24/2020 Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *PrimeOne Insurance Company* (LGra)
June 10, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by ALKATHI, INC against ALKATHI, INC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7844755 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (McCray, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALKATHI, INC v. PrimeOne Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALKATHI, INC
Represented By: Douglas G. McCray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PrimeOne Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?