Hometown Village of Marion Association v. Marion Township et al
Plaintiff: Hometown Village of Marion Association
Defendant: Marion Township, Delcor Homes - Hometown Village of Marion, Ltd., DTE Electric Company and Marion-Howell-Oceola-Genoa Water Authority
Case Number: 2:2020cv11458
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by DTE Electric Company (Prince, Leland)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by DTE Electric Company. (Prince, Leland)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Meagher on behalf of Marion Township. (Meagher, Thomas)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order REQUEST for SUMMONS for All Defendants. (Skowronski, Todd)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 [DOCUMENT TITLED: STATEMENT OF DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS AND FINANCIAL INTEREST] NOTICE by Hometown Village of Marion Association Corporate Disclosure Form (Skowronski, Todd) Modified on 6/5/2020 (LGra).
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 [DOCUMENT IS A CIVIL COVER SHEET] NOTICE by Hometown Village of Marion Association Civil Cover Sheet (Skowronski, Todd) Modified on 6/5/2020 (LGra).
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Hometown Village of Marion Association against DTE Electric Company, Delcor Homes - Hometown Village of Marion, Ltd., Marion Township. No summons requested. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7845053 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Livingston - County Where Action Arose: Livingston - County of 1st Defendant: Livingston. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I) (Skowronski, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hometown Village of Marion Association v. Marion Township et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hometown Village of Marion Association
Represented By: Todd J. Skowronski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Township
Represented By: Thomas R. Meagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delcor Homes - Hometown Village of Marion, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DTE Electric Company
Represented By: Leland Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion-Howell-Oceola-Genoa Water Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?