John R. Springs, Inc. v. Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Plaintiff: John R. Springs, Inc.
Defendant: Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv11536
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jarett Smith on behalf of All Defendants. (Smith, Jarett)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/15/2021; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 2/26/2021; Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2021 @ 02:00 PM before District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds; and Trailing Trial Docket set for 7/6/2021 @ 9:00 am - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (Refer to image for additional dates) (LBar)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by John R. Springs, Inc. (Feldman, Barry)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants (Moss, Bruce)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Moss, Bruce)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants (Moss, Bruce)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defense by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Moss, Bruce)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. John R. Springs, Inc. served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Feldman, Barry)
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 EXHIBIT K Amended re #1 Complaint,,,,, by John R. Springs, Inc. (Feldman, Barry)
June 12, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Affiliated FM Insurance Company* (SKra)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by John R. Springs, Inc. against Affiliated FM Insurance Company with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7858471 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Ins Policy 9/30/15-9/30/16, #2 Exhibit B Ins Policy 9/30/16-9/30/17, #3 Exhibit C Ins Policy 9/30/17-9/30/18, #4 Exhibit D Ins Policy 9/30/18-9/30/19, #5 Exhibit E 1/29/16 Risk Report, #6 Exhibit F 11/10/16 AFM Ltr, #7 Exhibit G 1/23/17 email, #8 Exhibit H 12/6/19 email, #9 Exhibit I 4/22/20 email, #10 Exhibit J 5/6/20 email, #11 Exhibit K Affidavit of Russell W. Birch PE, #12 Exhibit L 10/14/16 email, #13 Exhibit M 17 emails and invoices, #14 Exhibit N 10 emails, #15 Exhibit O 5/1/20 email, #16 Exhibit P 9/27/18 email, #17 Exhibit Q 7/10/19 email, #18 Exhibit R Factory Mutual v Apcompower, #19 Exhibit S 9/16/19 email, #20 Exhibit T 12/2/19 email, #21 Exhibit U 12/6/19 email, #22 Exhibit V 4/17/20 email, #23 Exhibit W 4/30/20 email, #24 Exhibit X 3/15/20 email) (Feldman, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John R. Springs, Inc. v. Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R. Springs, Inc.
Represented By: Barry M. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?