Kishore et al v. Whitmer et al
Plaintiff: Norissa Santa Cruz and Joseph Tanniru Kishore
Defendant: Secretary of State Jocelyn Benson, Gretchen Whitmer and Jonathan Brater
Case Number: 2:2020cv11605
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Sean F Cox
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendants to Respond re #1 Complaint. (Responsive Pleading due by 9/4/2020) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)ng
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendants to Respond re #1 Complaint. (Responsive Pleading due by 7/24/2020) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re #19 Notice of Appeal filed by Joseph Tanniru Kishore, Norissa Santa Cruz [Appeal Case Number 20-1661] (TTho)
July 13, 2020 Filing 20 Certificate of Service re #19 Notice of Appeal. (SKra)
July 13, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Joseph Tanniru Kishore, Norissa Santa Cruz re #17 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7920928 - Fee: $ 505 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Lee, Eric)
July 9, 2020 Filing 18 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 7/2/2020. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christin E. Russell) (Number of Pages: 22) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 7/30/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/10/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/7/2020. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Russell, C.)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OPINION AND ORDER Denying #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
July 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Joseph Tanniru Kishore, Norissa Santa Cruz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SawariMedia LLC v. Whitmer decision) (Lee, Eric)
July 2, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Sean F. Cox: Motion Hearing held on 7/2/2020 re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Joseph Tanniru Kishore, Norissa Santa Cruz. Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Christin Russell) (JMcC)
June 29, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of campaign volunteer Singh Ghuman, #2 Exhibit Contemporaneous notes of campaign volunteer Singh Ghuman) (Lee, Eric)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED ORDER Regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (MacKay, K)
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Kishore re #12 Order by All Plaintiffs (Lee, Eric)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (MacKay, K)
June 29, 2020 Filing 11 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Gretchen Whitmer. (Meingast, Heather)
June 29, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Gretchen Whitmer. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A. Declaration of Jonathan Brater) (Meingast, Heather)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #11 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (MacKay, K)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Erik A. Grill appearing on behalf of Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Gretchen Whitmer (Grill, Erik)
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Heather S. Meingast appearing on behalf of Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Gretchen Whitmer (Meingast, Heather)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCE on #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2020 at 03:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox |Zoom Webinar Information: Please click the link below to join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/95369587751?pwd=TmFxdENCb2VvVDc3cHZKSi9mYkE5Zz09 Password: 809037 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16027530140,,95369587751#,,,,0#,,809037# or +12133388477,,95369587751#,,,,0#,,809037#| (JMcC)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining, Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Joseph Tanniru Kishore, Norissa Santa Cruz. (Response due by 8:00 a.m. on 6/29/2020, Reply due by 8:00 a.m. 6/30/2020, Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2020 at 03:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
June 23, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Sean F. Cox: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/23/2020. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (JMcC)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Lee, Eric)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 6/23/2020 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Joseph Kishore, Socialist Equality Party candidate for U.S. president, and exibits, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Helen Halyard, veteran socialist campaigner, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Henrietta Freeman, Detroit public schoolteacher, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Florlisa Stebbins, Flint water activist, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of Gregory Near, retired Michigan Opera Theater Orchestra musician, #6 Exhibit Affidavit of Richard Winger and exhibits) (Lee, Eric)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Gretchen Whitmer* (SKra)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for declaratory and injunctive relief filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7872942 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Ingham. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lee, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kishore et al v. Whitmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State Jocelyn Benson
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Represented By: Erik A. Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Represented By: Erik A. Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Brater
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Represented By: Erik A. Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norissa Santa Cruz
Represented By: Eric Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Tanniru Kishore
Represented By: Eric Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?