Belser v. Michigan Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Marvin Belser, Sr.
Defendant: Michigan Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2020cv11734
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul D Borman
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #7 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Marvin Belser, #352904 at Duane L. Waters Health Center, 3855 Cooper Street, Jackson MI 49201 (DTof)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford Including #6 Motion. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Court assistance in internal redress by Marvin Belser, Sr. (DPer)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Marvin Belser, Sr. (ATee)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Correct Deficiency for failure to submit filing fee. Correction due by 8/14/2020 Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (NAhm)
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Marvin Belser, Sr against Michigan Department of Corrections. (document titled as a motion for cease and desist order; identical to document #1 , but with an additional page 2) (DPer)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Marvin Belser, Sr against Michigan Department of Corrections (DAll) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2020: #1 Coversheet) (DAll).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belser v. Michigan Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Belser, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?