Stormborn Technologies LLC v. Danlaw, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stromborn Technologies LLC and Stormborn Technologies LLC
Defendant: Danlaw, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv11751
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Paul D Borman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell Zajac on behalf of Danlaw, Inc.. (Zajac, Mitchell)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF STORMBORN TECHNOLOGIES LLC,LLC TO IDENTIFY ITS INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS( Response due by 7/21/2020) Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Danlaw, Inc.* (DAll)
July 1, 2020 Deficiency Corrected re #4 Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. (DAll)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 7/8/2020 (SKra)
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Stormborn Technologies LLC (Goss, Maxwell)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 Patent Report Sent To Washington (Goss, Maxwell)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC against Danlaw, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Fee Paid Receipt # AMIEDC-7894112 $400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Goss, Maxwell) Modified on 7/1/2020 (DAll).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stormborn Technologies LLC v. Danlaw, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stromborn Technologies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stormborn Technologies LLC
Represented By: Maxwell J. Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danlaw, Inc.
Represented By: Mitchell Zajac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?