National Association of Home Builders et al v. United States Small Business Administration et al
Plaintiff: Home Builders Association of Michigan, Home Builders Association of Southeastern Michigan and National Association of Home Builders
Defendant: The United States of America, United States Small Business Administration, Steven Mnuchin, in his official capacity as United States Secretary of Treasury and Jovita Carranza, in her official capacity as Administrator of the Small Business Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv11780
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David M Lawson
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by All Defendants (Gilligan, James)
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Steven Mnuchin, in his official capacity as United States Secretary of Treasury served on 07/08/20. (Gorga, Nicholas)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. United States Small Business Administration served on 07/07/20. (Gorga, Nicholas)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Jovita Carranza, in her official capacity as Administrator of the Small Business Administration served on 07/07/20. (Gorga, Nicholas)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Shirin S. Goyal on behalf of Home Builders Association of Michigan, Home Builders Association of Southeastern Michigan, National Association of Home Builders. (Goyal, Shirin)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney General served on 07/08/20. (Gorga, Nicholas)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of The United States of America served on 7/8/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Gorga, Nicholas)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Jovita Carranza, in her official capacity as Administrator of the Small Business Administration, Steven Mnuchin, in his official capacity as United States Secretary of Treasury, The United States of America, United States Small Business Administration* (TTho)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (TTho)
July 1, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho)
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by National Association of Home Builders (Gorga, Nicholas)
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Home Builders Association of Southeastern Michigan (Gorga, Nicholas)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Home Builders Association of Michigan (Gorga, Nicholas)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7896973 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Out of State - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 20-cv-10899, Judge Hon. Judge Matthew J. Leitman] (Gorga, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Association of Home Builders et al v. United States Small Business Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home Builders Association of Michigan
Represented By: Nicholas B Gorga
Represented By: Shirin S. Goyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home Builders Association of Southeastern Michigan
Represented By: Nicholas B Gorga
Represented By: Shirin S. Goyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Association of Home Builders
Represented By: Nicholas B Gorga
Represented By: Shirin S. Goyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Small Business Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Mnuchin, in his official capacity as United States Secretary of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jovita Carranza, in her official capacity as Administrator of the Small Business Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?