Zymak v. ADDUCCI et al
Petitioner: Volodymyr Zymak
Respondent: Dep. Director ICE MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, Sec. DHS Chad F. Wolf, U.S. Atty. General WILLIAM P BARR, Director ICE Detroit REBECCA J. ADDUCCI, Sheriff Mike Bitnar and Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 2:2020cv11786
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (Sandusky, K)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION and ORDER Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Dismissing Complaint. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (Sandusky, K)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 REPLY to Response to Plaintiff's Petition for Habeas Corpus filed by Volodymyr Zymak. (Daman, Julian)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Requiring Reply re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Deportation. Reply due by 8/4/2020 Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Deportation,, by REBECCA J. ADDUCCI, MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM P BARR, Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1. Declaration of Deportation Officer Anna Saunders, #3 Exhibit 2. Declaration of Assistant Field Office Director James Jacobs) (Toomey, Zak)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Requiring Response to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Deportation. Response due by 7/27/2020. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Zak Toomey on behalf of REBECCA J. ADDUCCI, MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM P BARR, Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf. (Toomey, Zak)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Regarding Deportation filed by Volodymyr Zymak against Volodymyr Zymak, Receipt No: AMIEDC-7899572 - Fee: 5 dollars. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Notice to Appear, #3 Exhibit Order of the Immigration Judge, #4 Exhibit BIA Order of Dismissal, #5 Exhibit BIA Order for Stay of Removal and Filing Receipt, #6 Exhibit Affidavit of Petitioner to BIA, #7 Exhibit Letter from Petitioner to Former Attorney, #8 Exhibit Grievance Against Former Attorney) (Daman, Julian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zymak v. ADDUCCI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dep. Director ICE MATTHEW T. ALBENCE
Represented By: Zak Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sec. DHS Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Zak Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Atty. General WILLIAM P BARR
Represented By: Zak Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director ICE Detroit REBECCA J. ADDUCCI
Represented By: Zak Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Mike Bitnar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Zak Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Volodymyr Zymak
Represented By: Julian Mansoor Daman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?